Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2021 at 23:26:52 (UTC).

McClain et al v. US Coachways, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/07/2020 McClain filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against US Coachways, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian M. Cogan and Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01717

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Brian M. Cogan

Ramon E. Reyes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jasmin Johnson

Porsha Jackman

Joseph Jacovino

Jennifer Jacovino

Shalonda Solomon

Susan Barrett

Crystal McClain

Wakey Robinson

James Saunders

Andre Kimbell

Steffon Issacs

Defendants

American Tour & Travel, Inc.

Ultra-Express Coach, Inc.

KM Enterprises of NY, Inc.

Edward Telmany

Mark Telmany

Subout.com, LLC

US Coachways, Inc.

Nicholas Cianciaruso

U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc.

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bennitta L. Joseph

Attorney at Joseph & Norinsberg, LLC

110 East 59Th Street, Suite 3200

New York, NY 10022

Jon L. Norinsberg

Attorney at Jon L. Norinsberg, Esq.

110 East 59Th Street, Suite 3200

New York, NY 10022

Diego Oswaldo Barros

Attorney at JOSEPH & NORINSBERG, LLC

110 East 59Th Street, Suite 3200, 10022

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R. Capobianco

Attorney at Littler Mendelson P.C.

290 Broadhollow Road, Ste 305

Melville, NY 11747

Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

290 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Melville, NY 11747

 

Court Documents

#35

(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer to second amended complaint by American Tour & Travel, Inc., Subout.com, LLC, Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc., US Coachways, Inc., Ultra-Express Coach, Inc.. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#31

No Description Available

#30

AMENDED ORDER re #29 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as against all Defendants as against all Defendants filed by Jasmin Johnson, #30 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as against all Defendants filed by Joseph Jacovino. Plaintiffs Joseph Jacovino and Jasmin Johnson terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/24/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 11/30/2020 (Vertus, Miriam). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#28

No Description Available

#27

No Description Available

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

#18

No Description Available

#16

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Diego Oswaldo Barros on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Barros, Diego) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12644157 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jennifer Jacovino, Shalonda Solomon, Joseph Jacovino, Porsha Jackman, Jasmin Johnson, Crystal McClain, Susan Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rider to Summons) (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #35 Motion for Defendants U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc., Subout.com, LLC, Mark Telmany, Ultra-Express Coach, Inc., Edward Telmany answer, US Coachways, Inc., and American Tour & Travel, Inc., Extension of Time to File Answer to the Second Amended Complaint by January 29, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer to second amended complaint by American Tour & Travel, Inc., Subout.com, LLC, Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc., US Coachways, Inc., Ultra-Express Coach, Inc.. (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/7/2021. (Reyes, Ramon) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Complaint by American Tour & Travel, Inc., Subout.com, LLC, Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc., US Coachways, Inc., Ultra-Express Coach, Inc.. (Capobianco, Matthew) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER The Court adopts the CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT/PLAN #33 . All discovery, including depositions of experts, shall be completed on or before 9/30/2021 Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 13D South before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. The parties are directed to use the AT&T toll-free number 1-888-684-8852 and access code 5496961# to participate in the scheduled telephone conference. (See document #33 for other deadlines). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/8/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT /PLAN (Barros, Diego) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #32 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Order dismissing Plaintiff Jasmin Johnson's claims "with prejudice," to "without prejudice". Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/25/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Letter MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Order dismissing Plaintiff Jasmin Johnson's claims "with prejudice," to "without prejudice" by Susan Barrett, Toby Hicks, Steffon Issacs, Porsha Jackman, Jennifer Jacovino, Andre Kimbell, Crystal McClain, Wakey Robinson, James Saunders, Shalonda Solomon, Edward Williams. (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 11/24/2020. Appearances: Diego Barros, Esq. and Jon Norinsberg, Esq. for Plaintiffs; Daniel Gomez-Sanchez, Esq. and Matthew Capobianco, Esq. for Defendants. Discussions held. The parties are directed to submit a joint Case Management Statement by 12/11/2020. (AT&T Log #12:01:00-12:23:00) (Naseef, Kara) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER re #29 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as against all Defendants as against all Defendants filed by Jasmin Johnson, #30 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as against all Defendants filed by Joseph Jacovino. Plaintiffs Joseph Jacovino and Jasmin Johnson terminated. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/24/2020. (Vertus, Miriam) Modified on 11/30/2020 (Vertus, Miriam). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Sergio Gomez-Sanchez on behalf of American Tour & Travel, Inc., Nicholas Cianciaruso, Subout.com, LLC, Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc., Ultra-Express Coach, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Gomez-Sanchez, Daniel) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Barrett, Porsha Jackman, Jennifer Jacovino, Joseph Jacovino, Jasmin Johnson, Crystal McClain, Shalonda Solomon (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Diego Oswaldo Barros on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Barros, Diego) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bennitta L. Joseph on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Joseph, Bennitta) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 5/20/2020 at 10:45 AM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/7/2020. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12644157 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jennifer Jacovino, Shalonda Solomon, Joseph Jacovino, Porsha Jackman, Jasmin Johnson, Crystal McClain, Susan Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Rider to Summons) (Norinsberg, Jon) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bus Charter & Limo, Inc. is a litigant