This case was last updated from PACER on 11/24/2019 at 08:37:30 (UTC).

McClafferty v. Portage County Board of Commissioners et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by McClafferty against Portage County Board of Commissioners in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02219

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brett M. McClafferty

Conneaut, OH 44030

Defendants

William Burns

Cory Germani

Bryan Morgenstern

Michael Burda

Daniel Burns

Dale Kelly

David W. Doak

CCS, LLC

Amy Beans

Unknown Defendants

Coleman Professional Services

Dr. Brian Welsh

Portage County Board of Commissioners

Correct Care Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Kathleen M. Minahan

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

Todd M. Raskin

Attorney at Mazanec, Raskin & Ryder - Cleveland

100 Franklin'S Row, 34305 Solon Road

Cleveland, OH 44139

John F. Bodie

Attorney at Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Cleveland

One Cleveland Center, 1375 East Ninth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Justin S. Greenfelder

Attorney at Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs - Canton

4277 Munson Street, Nw

Canton, OH 44718

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Greenfelder and John F. Bodie filed by on behalf of Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Greenfelder, Justin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance by Todd M. Raskin and Kathleen M. Minahan filed by on behalf of Amy Beans, Michael Burda, Daniel Burns, William Burns, David W. Doak, Cory Germani, Dale Kelly, Bryan Morgenstern, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (Raskin, Todd) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#3

(#3) Request for Service by the U.S. Marshal filed by Brett M. McClafferty. (S,Ke) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

2 #2

Inmate Statement

2 #1

Affidavit

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Brett M. McClafferty. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Inmate Statement)(S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

1 #4

envelope

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Various documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Brett M. McClafferty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Various documents, #3 Summons, #4 envelope) (S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Greenfelder and John F. Bodie filed by on behalf of Correct Care Solutions, LLC. (Greenfelder, Justin) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Attorney Appearance by Todd M. Raskin and Kathleen M. Minahan filed by on behalf of Amy Beans, Michael Burda, Daniel Burns, William Burns, David W. Doak, Cory Germani, Dale Kelly, Bryan Morgenstern, Portage County Board of Commissioners. (Raskin, Todd) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Service by the U.S. Marshal filed by Brett M. McClafferty. (S,Ke) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Brett M. McClafferty. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Inmate Statement)(S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Brett M. McClafferty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Various documents, #3 Summons, #4 envelope) (S,SR) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.