Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/20/2021 at 10:38:36 (UTC).

McChristian v. Neal et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 McChristian filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Neal. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Boyd McChristian

Michigan City, IN 46360

Defendants

Ron Neal

Internal Investigator

Pam Banes

Bootz

Anderson

Houston

B Leonard

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF #3 and #4 , ORDERS the plaintiff, Boyd McChristian, IDOC #138044, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $10.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/22/21. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

4 #1

Envelope

#4

(#4) Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

3 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Boyd McChristian until 3/1/21 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion on the courts approved form which can be found in his prison law library Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) a companied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Boyd McChristian that if he does not respond by the deadlinethis case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/29/21. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Anderson, Pam Banes, Bootz, Houston, Internal Investigator, B Leonard, Ron Neal, filed by Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to McChristian)(kms) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF #3 and #4 , ORDERS the plaintiff, Boyd McChristian, IDOC #138044, to immediately pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) $10.00 to the clerk in payment of the initial partial filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full, DIRECTS the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds and DIRECTS the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 2/22/21. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docket***Deficiency Deadline terminated. (kms) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kms) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER: The Court GRANTS Boyd McChristian until 3/1/21 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion on the courts approved form which can be found in his prison law library Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) a companied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Boyd McChristian that if he does not respond by the deadlinethis case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/29/21. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Anderson, Pam Banes, Bootz, Houston, Internal Investigator, B Leonard, Ron Neal, filed by Boyd McChristian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(No filing fee or IFP received)(File stamped copy with case number sent to McChristian)(kms) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOUSTON'S is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDERSON, INC., THE is a litigant