This case was last updated from PACER on 01/19/2020 at 07:42:35 (UTC).

McCathron v. IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 McCathron filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against IHA of Ann Arbor, P C d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Steven Whalen and Sean F. Cox. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13439

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

R. Steven Whalen

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth McCathron

Defendant

IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Manda L. Danieleski

Attorney at Law Office of Manda L. Danieleski

905 N. Michigan Ave., Saginaw

Saginaw, MI 48602

Defendant Attorneys

Terrence J. Miglio

Attorney at Varnum LLP

160 W. Fort Street, Fifth Floor

Detroit, MI 48226

Barbara E. Buchanan

Attorney at Varnum LLP

160 W. Fort Street, Fifth Floor

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara E. Buchanan on behalf of IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Buchanan, Barbara) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics from Livingston County Circuit Court, case number 19-30500-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7495392 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics identifying Corporate Parent IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics for IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#6

(#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Danieleski, Manda) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Danieleski, Manda) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 1/21/2020 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (Zaidel, B) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics identifying Corporate Parent IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics for IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara E. Buchanan on behalf of IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics. (Buchanan, Barbara) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IHA of Ann Arbor, P.C. d/b/a IHA Livingston Pediatrics from Livingston County Circuit Court, case number 19-30500-CD. Receipt No: 0645-7495392 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Miglio, Terrence) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.