This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 09:29:27 (UTC).

McCarthy v. National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 McCarthy filed a Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act lawsuit against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Amtrak. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00955

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Federal Employers Liability Act

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael T McCarthy

Defendant

National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas M. McCarthy

Attorney at Single Practitioner

116 John Street, Suite 1106

New York, NY 10038

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)..(pc) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#8

(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#7

(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/11/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#6

(#6) COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak). Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#5

(#5) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael T McCarthy. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

#1

(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Michael T McCarthy. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806718)Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak)..(pc) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #7 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney address field is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION, (AMTRAK), re: #6 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/11/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak). Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name on the 'as to' docket entry text must match exactly as it appears on the pleading caption; summons request must be linked to the properly filed pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FILING ERROR - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #3 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McCarthy, Thomas) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against National Railroad Passenger Corporation, (Amtrak) with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Michael T McCarthy. Related document: #1 Complaint,..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/9/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the docket entry must exactly match how it is listed on the complaint caption title (Amtrak was not included);. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Thomas M. McCarthy. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thomas M. McCarthy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: National Railroad Passenger Corporation, Michael T McCarthy. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Railroad Passenger Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Michael T McCarthy. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23806718)Document filed by Michael T McCarthy..(McCarthy, Thomas) Modified on 2/4/2021 (pc). (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS M. MCCARTHY(Designation Retained)