This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:21:30 (UTC).

MCCARTHY et al v. INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 MCCARTHY filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is BERLE M. SCHILLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05727

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BERLE M. SCHILLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE RANK AND FILE MEMBERS OF IAM DISTRICT LODGE 19

ROBERT EDDIS

MICHAEL MCCARTHY

Defendants

INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS

MICHAEL PERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALICE W. BALLARD

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALICE W. BALLARD, PC

123 S. Broad St Suite 2135

Philadelphia, PA 19109

ROBERT S. GOGGIN, III

Attorney at KELLER & GOGGIN

1528 Walnut Street, Suite 900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

SAMUEL L. SPEAR

Attorney at SPEAR WILDERMAN BORISH ENDY SPEAR & RUNCKEL

230 S. Broad St., 14Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JEFFREY ANDREW BARTOS

Attorney at GUERRIERI EDMOND CLAYMAN & BARTOS, PC

1625 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W., Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

RAZIYA O. BRUMFIELD

1900 M Street Nw Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

ELIZABETH A. ROMA

Attorney at GUERRIERI BARTOS & ROMA, P.C.

1900 M Street, Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE A CONTINUANCE OF ONE WEEK TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IS CURRENTLY DUE ON 2/4/20. THE PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CONTINUANCE TO 2/11/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/31/20. 1/31/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#19

(#19) STIPULATION re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Consent for Continuance by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTACHMENT CONTAINS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER, AND IS BEING FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SPEAR, SAMUEL) Modified on 1/31/2020 (fb). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

18 #4

Text of Proposed Order

18 #3

Exhibit B

18 #2

Exhibit A

18 #1

Memorandum

#18

(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BRUMFIELD, RAZIYA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/8/20.1/8/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY A. BARTOS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. GOGGIN, III on behalf of ROBERT EDDIS, MICHAEL MCCARTHY (GOGGIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. ROMA on behalf of INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY (ROMA, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Letter re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY. (ROMA, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/10/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

2 #4

Certificate of Service

2 #3

Text of Proposed Order

2 #2

Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Rest

2 #1

Complaint

#2

(#3) Letter re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY. (ROMA, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/10/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207025.), filed by MICHAEL MCCARTHY, ROBERT EDDIS, THE RANK AND FILE MEMBERS OF IAM DISTRICT LODGE 19.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE A CONTINUANCE OF ONE WEEK TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS. PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IS CURRENTLY DUE ON 2/4/20. THE PARTIES STIPULATE TO A CONTINUANCE TO 2/11/20; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/31/20. 1/31/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Consent for Continuance by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; ATTACHMENT CONTAINS INCORRECT CASE NUMBER, AND IS BEING FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (SPEAR, SAMUEL) Modified on 1/31/2020 (fb). (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(BRUMFIELD, RAZIYA) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DENIED; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/8/20.1/8/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF JEFFREY A. BARTOS TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF RAZIYA BRUMFIELD TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/7/20. 1/7/20 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey A. Bartos ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14023044.) filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.Certificate of Service.(SPEAR, SAMUEL) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Raziya Brumfield ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-14023026.) filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS.Certificate of Service.(SPEAR, SAMUEL) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Harvey Jessup re: served Complaint upon Mark Schneider by Personal service on 01/02/2020 (GOGGIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Gooden re: served Complaint upon Michael Perry by Personal service on 12/31/2019 (GOGGIN, ROBERT) Modified on 1/9/2020 (fb). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS Notice of Article L Trial Date (SPEAR, SAMUEL) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by SAMUEL L. SPEAR on behalf of INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY with Certificate of Service(SPEAR, SAMUEL) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS GRANTED INSOFAR AS THE PARTIES HAVE AGREED TO POSTPONE MCCARTHY'S TRIAL DATE TO A LATER DATE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 12/9/19.12/9/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT S. GOGGIN, III on behalf of ROBERT EDDIS, MICHAEL MCCARTHY (GOGGIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH A. ROMA on behalf of INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY (ROMA, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY. (ROMA, ELIZABETH) Modified on 12/10/2019 (fb). (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by MICHAEL MCCARTHY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(BALLARD, ALICE) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • 2 Summons Issued as to INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 12/6/2019 (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT EDDIS, MICHAEL MCCARTHY, THE RANK AND FILE MEMBERS OF IAM DISTRICT LODGE 19. (bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, MICHAEL PERRY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207025.), filed by MICHAEL MCCARTHY, ROBERT EDDIS, THE RANK AND FILE MEMBERS OF IAM DISTRICT LODGE 19.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.