This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:11:36 (UTC).

MCCANTS v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MCCANTS against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03234

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

M CASEY RODGERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT MCCANTS

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

 

Court Documents

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7411293) filed by Robert McCants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Robert McCants(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit B

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

3 #1

Exhibit A

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#7

(#7) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01146. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-01146. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/21/2019.(pp)(NEF:HON. CARL J. BARBIER) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than July 1, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to showcause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than July 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/4/19.(ko) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Scott C. Seiler added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Seiler, Scott) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 03/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7411293) filed by Robert McCants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Robert McCants(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/22/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.