This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 07:14:37 (UTC).

McCammon N v. Bradford Supply Company

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 a Labor - Family & Medical Leave case was filed by McCammon N against Bradford Supply Company in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00980

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gilbert C. Sison

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl L. McCammon

Defendant

Bradford Supply Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P. Kondras, Jr.

Attorney at Hassler Kondras Miller LLP

100 Cherry Street

Terre Haute, IN 47807

Defendant Attorneys

Adam S. Glass

Attorney at Fine & Hatfield

520 N.W. Second Street, P.O. Box 779

Evansville, IN 47705-0779

Danny E. Glass

Attorney at Fine & Hatfield

520 N.W. Second Street, P.O. Box 779

Evansville, IN 47705-0779

Kristin T.M. McLaughlin

Attorney at Fine & Hatfield

520 N.W. Second Street, P.O. Box 779

Evansville, IN 47705-0779

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Bradford Supply Company.(Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin T.M. McLaughlin on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (McLaughlin, Kristin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Adam) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl L. McCammon. Bradford Supply Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bradford Supply Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-980-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BRADFORD SUPPLY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3970461.), filed by CARL L. MCCAMMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Kondras, Jr. on behalf of CARL L. MCCAMMON (Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bradford Supply Company and original mailed to Attorney Kondras. (kek) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 #2

Summons

#13

(#13) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Kondras, Jr., Robert) Modified on 10/4/2019 (kek). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

3 #1

Consent Brochure

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Danny E. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER DENYING #11 Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant Bradford Supply Company. On September 9, 2019, this case was randomly assigned to the undersigned Chief District Judge, who is located in the East St. Louis Courthouse (Doc. 3). See SDIL-LR 40.1. Defendant now asks the Court to transfer this case to the Benton division of the Southern District of Illinois under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). That statute permits a district court to transfer a civil action to "any other district or division where it might have been brought" for the convenience of parties and witnesses. 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). There is, however, only one division in the Southern District of Illinois. 28 U.S.C. 93. "Benton is not, in fact, a division of the Southern District of Illinois separate and apart from the federal district courthouse located in East Saint Louis, Illinois (where this case has been assigned)." Craig v. Harrah's Entm't, Inc., 2006 WL 1004931 *1 (S.D. Ill. Apr. 13, 2006). Because there is no other division in the Southern District of Illinois in which this case might have been brought, Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 10/7/2019. (mlp) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin T.M. McLaughlin on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (McLaughlin, Kristin) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam S. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Adam) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #13 Objection filed by Carl L. McCammon. Incorrect filing event chosen. In order to properly create a document association to the Motion, filer should have used the event "Response to Motion" located under Civil > Motions and Related Filings > Memoranda in Support, Responses and Replies. Docket text has been modified as follows: Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. (Kondras, Jr., Robert) Modified on 10/4/2019 (kek). (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison on 10/1/2019. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Bradford Supply Company.(Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bradford Supply Company. (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Bradford Supply Company. Document attached is a proposed order. Proposed orders are not to be filed, rather they should be submitted via email to the appropriate Judge. Proposed order to be deleted in accordance with this Court's practices and should be submitted accordingly. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bradford Supply Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Danny E. Glass on behalf of Bradford Supply Company (Glass, Danny) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carl L. McCammon. Bradford Supply Company served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Bradford Supply Company and original mailed to Attorney Kondras. (kek) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel and Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison assigned. All future documents must bear case number 19-980-NJR-GCS. If the parties consent to Magistrate Judge assignment, the consent form with instruction is attached for your convenience. (Attachments: #1 Consent Brochure)(kek) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Kondras, Jr. on behalf of CARL L. MCCAMMON (Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BRADFORD SUPPLY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-3970461.), filed by CARL L. MCCAMMON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kondras, Jr., Robert) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.