This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 05:36:18 (UTC).

McCallum v. Camping World, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 McCallum filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Camping World, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orlando L. Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01021

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orlando L. Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Martina McCallum

Defendants

Direcsource, Ltd.

Barbaras Development, Inc.

Camping World, Inc.

Direcsource

Camping World Holdings

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bernardo Gonzalez

Miguel Luis Hernandez

Thomas J. Henry

Defendant Attorneys

John A. Guerra

Greg R. Hokenson

Amanda E. Carollo

Adrian R. Ciechanowicz

David E. Chamberlain

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #7

Exhibit Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Supplement

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2020 10:00 AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, Jury Selection and Trial set for 6/29/2020 9:30AM before Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/29/2019, ADR Mediation Completed by 4/17/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2019, Discovery due by 2/28/2020, Motions due by 3/13/2020,. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by Barbaras Development, Inc.. (Hokenson, Greg) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Joint by Barbaras Development, Inc.. (Hokenson, Greg) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Camping World, Inc.. (Ciechanowicz, Adrian) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Camping World, Inc.. (Ciechanowicz, Adrian) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Barbaras Development, Inc.. (Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Barbaras Development, Inc.. (Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Martina McCallum. (Gonzalez, Bernardo) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for Scheduling Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the Plaintiff(s) confer with the Defendant(s) as required by Fed.R.Civ.P 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Court's consideration within forty-five(45) days of the filing of this Order. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Barbaras Development a/k/a Direcsource. (Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Barbaras Development a/k/a Direcsource (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12513903), filed by Barbaras Development a/k/a Direcsource. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Carollo, Amanda) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less