Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 09:45:43 (UTC).

McCall v. Covidien LP et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 McCall filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Covidien LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine D Little and John F Heil, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00005

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

Presiding Judge

John F Heil, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dani McCall

Defendants

Joshua Mourot

Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A.

Coviden, L.P.

Northwest Medical Center

Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC doing business as Northwest Medical Center - Springdale previously named as Northwest Medical Center

Covidien LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Donald Eugene Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

John William Warren

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

James W Connor, Jr

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 S Main Flr 12

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

Adam Leigh Wilson

Attorney at Richards & Connor

525 S Main Flr 12

Tulsa, OK 74103-4509

Hayden Ryan King

Attorney at Wiggins Sewell & Ogletree

210 Park Ave, Ste 3100, Oklahoma City

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

L Earl Ogletree

Attorney at Wiggins Sewell & Ogletree

210 W Park Ave Ste 3100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Johnathan Dwaine Horton

Attorney at Wright Lindsey & Jennings

200 W Capital Ave, Ste 2200

Little Rock, AR 72201

Ashley Marie Schovanec

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

101 N Robinson 13Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Thomas Gilmer Wolfe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

101 N Robinson 13Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy Durrell White

Attorney at Phillips Murrah PC

101 N Robinson 13Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

37 #1

Appendix Exhibit 1 - Symbotex Product Label / Instructions for Use

#37

(#37) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Covidien LP (With attachments) (Schovanec, Ashley) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#36

(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joshua Mourot (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

35 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Joshua Mourot, MD

#35

(#35) MOTION to Dismiss Party Joshua Mourot, MD Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Joshua Mourot (With attachments) (Wilson, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#34

(#34) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam Leigh Wilson on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney Adam Leigh Wilson added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#33

(#33) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James W Connor, Jr on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney James W Connor, Jr added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Connor, James) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

32 #4

Exhibit 4

32 #3

Exhibit 3

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Tenyson Holdings, LLC for Northwest Medical Center) by Northwest Medical Center (Horton, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnathan Dwaine Horton on behalf of Northwest Medical Center [Note: Attorney Johnathan Dwaine Horton added to party Northwest Medical Center(pty:dft).] (Horton, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Northwest Medical Center (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Coviden, L.P. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/8/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR - duplicate entry of #4 (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#4

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/8/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR - duplicate entry of #4 (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#2

(#28) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Ogletree, L) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Covidien LP (With attachments) (Schovanec, Ashley) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joshua Mourot (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Dismiss Party Joshua Mourot, MD Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Joshua Mourot (With attachments) (Wilson, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam Leigh Wilson on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney Adam Leigh Wilson added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Adam) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James W Connor, Jr on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney James W Connor, Jr added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Connor, James) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Bases ) by Dani McCall ; [Note: Attorney John William Warren added to party Dani McCall(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Warren, John) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Covidien Holding Inc., Corporate Parent Medtronic PLC for Covidien LP) by Covidien LP (Schovanec, Ashley) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Ogletree, L) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Ogletree, L) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Tenyson Holdings, LLC for Northwest Medical Center) by Northwest Medical Center (Horton, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnathan Dwaine Horton on behalf of Northwest Medical Center [Note: Attorney Johnathan Dwaine Horton added to party Northwest Medical Center(pty:dft).] (Horton, Johnathan) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Northwest Medical Center (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Coviden, L.P. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/8/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR - duplicate entry of #4 (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Judge John F Heil, III, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-5-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Coviden, L.P., Joshua Mourot, Northwest Medical Center, Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2332436) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Northwest Medical Center, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John William Warren

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene Smolen, II