This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2019 at 07:08:07 (UTC).

Michael McCain v. Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828 et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Michael McCain filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00228

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael McCain

Defendants

Ventura County Community College District

American Federation of Teachers

Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas O Myers

Angel J Valencia

Milton L Chappell

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer Elgant Covert

Scott A Kronland

Rebecca C Lee

Eileen B Goldsmith

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Elgant Covert on behalf of Defendant Ventura County Community College District (Attorney Spencer Elgant Covert added to party Ventura County Community College District(pty:dft))(Covert, Spencer) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON (tg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV13-00676 JLS(CWx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV19-00228 JLS(DFMx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (lwag) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-08999-JLS-DFM; 2:18-cv-06793-JLS-DFM; 8:18-cv-00994-JLS-DFM; 8:18-cv-01169-JLS-DFM; 2:18-cv-09531-JLS-DFM (Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Federation of Teachers answer now due 3/12/2019; Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO answer now due 3/12/2019; Ventura County Community College District answer now due 3/12/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Federation of Teachers; Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO.(Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott A Kronland on behalf of Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO (Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party American Federation of Teachers(pty:dft), Attorney Scott A Kronland added to party Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO(pty:dft))(Kronland, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eileen B Goldsmith on behalf of Defendants American Federation of Teachers, Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO (Attorney Eileen B Goldsmith added to party American Federation of Teachers(pty:dft), Attorney Eileen B Goldsmith added to party Ventura County Federation of College Teachers, AFT Local 1828, AFL-CIO(pty:dft))(Goldsmith, Eileen) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service Documents > Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints > Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain, re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #9 , Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #10 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 served on 1-25-19. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Angel J. Valencia APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Michael McCain, designating Thomas O. Myers as local counsel. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ventura County Community College District. (esa) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant American Federation of Teachers. (esa) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain, identifying The Classes He Seeks to Represent. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Summons Request #4 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Summons Request #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Michael McCain. (Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23023671 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff and the Classes He Seeks to Represent Michael McCain. (Attorney Thomas O Myers added to party Michael McCain(pty:pla))(Myers, Thomas) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less