This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 07:25:33 (UTC).

Alison Lorraine McCabe v. Sony Music Holdings Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Alison Lorraine McCabe filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Sony Music Holdings Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alison Lorraine McCabe

Defendants

Sony Music Holdings Inc. doing business as Sony Music Entertainment

Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC

Sony Music Publishing US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at Sriplaw

8730 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Matthew Laurence Rollin

Attorney at Sriplaw

8730 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorney

Peter J. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2566

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court denies the parties' Stipulation #14 . Defendants must file an initial response to the complaint by 3/7/2022. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

14 #1

Proposed Order

14 #14

Main Document

1 #17

Exhibit 17 - Shafeika & Rowlin Ask for Proposal

1 #16

Exhibit 16 - Shafeika Jardine Taking Splits

1 #15

Exhibit 15 - Rowlin Naicker Talking Splits

1 #14

Exhibit 14 - Sony SyncShop Email Trail

1 #13

Exhibit 13 - Returned C&D

1 #11

Exhibit 11 - Youtube Copyright Complaint Email Trail

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - ASCAP & SonyATV Email Trail

1 #9

Exhibit 9 - ASCAP Comms and SAMRO Email

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Pandora SAY Credits Page

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Cover Sheet for Conventional Filing

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - ASCAP Statements

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Deeplay Release Sheet 9-11-2005

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - SAY Heads of License Agreement Apr 2004

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Registration

1 #1

Main Document

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court denies the parties' Stipulation #14 . Defendants must file an initial response to the complaint by 3/7/2022. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to April 6, 2022 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by defendants Sony Music Holdings Inc., Sony Music Publishing US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Sony Music Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Peter J. Anderson added to party Sony Music Publishing US LLC(pty:dft))(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sony Music Holdings Inc. answer now due 3/7/2022; Sony Music Publishing US LLC answer now due 3/7/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe.(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe, upon Defendant Sony Music Holdings Inc. served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022; Sony Music Publishing US LLC served on 1/14/2022, answer due 2/4/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, Authorized Agent for Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sony Music Publishing US LLC. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Sony Music Holdings Inc. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (et) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alison Lorraine McCabe. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe, (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe. (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32579423 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Alison Lorraine McCabe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - SAY Heads of License Agreement Apr 2004, #3 Exhibit 3 - Deeplay Release Sheet 9-11-2005, #4 Exhibit 4 - Cover Sheet for Conventional Filing, #5 Exhibit 5 - ASCAP Statements, #6 Exhibit 6 - Cover Sheet for Conventional Filing, #7 Exhibit 7 - Something About You Sony Unlicensed, #8 Exhibit 8 - Pandora SAY Credits Page, #9 Exhibit 9 - ASCAP Comms and SAMRO Email, #10 Exhibit 10 - ASCAP & SonyATV Email Trail, #11 Exhibit 11 - Youtube Copyright Complaint Email Trail, #12 Exhibit 12 - Dec 23 2019 C&D to Sony, #13 Exhibit 13 - Returned C&D, #14 Exhibit 14 - Sony SyncShop Email Trail, #15 Exhibit 15 - Rowlin Naicker Talking Splits, #16 Exhibit 16 - Shafeika Jardine Taking Splits, #17 Exhibit 17 - Shafeika & Rowlin Ask for Proposal, #18 Exhibit 18 - Hiroshan Moodley Sony Cover-Up, #19 Exhibit 19 - 9-20-21 Streaming Platforms, #20 Exhibit 20 - YouTube Sony Vid & Comments) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Alison Lorraine McCabe(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sony Music Publishing (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY MUSIC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J Anderson