This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:09:31 (UTC).

McCabe v. Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 McCabe filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara L. Ellis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07604

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara L. Ellis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan P. McCabe

Defendant

Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Donald Coleman

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Nathan Charles Volheim

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.

2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Defendant Attorneys

Brandon S. Stein

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 N. Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

David M Schultz

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

151 North Franklin Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Due to scheduling conflict of the Court, Status hearing set for 1/21/2020 is stricken and reset to 1/23/2020 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ryan P. McCabe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16450218. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ryan P. McCabe. Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/21/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/14/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#11

(#11) STATUS Report Initial by Ryan P. McCabe (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Due to scheduling conflict of the Court, Status hearing set for 1/21/2020 is stricken and reset to 1/23/2020 at 1:30 PM. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATUS Report Initial by Ryan P. McCabe (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. by David M Schultz (Schultz, David) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ryan P. McCabe. Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/21/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/14/2020. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Midstate Collection Solutions, Inc. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Alejandro Emmanuel Figueroa (Figueroa, Alejandro) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Eric Donald Coleman (Coleman, Eric) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Ryan P. McCabe by Nathan Charles Volheim (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ryan P. McCabe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16450218. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less