This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/13/2022 at 12:05:35 (UTC).

McBryde et al v. Freedom Mortgage et al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 McBryde filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Freedom Mortgage. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Pitman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01038

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert Pitman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anthony McBryde

Austin, TX 78753

Aileen Name McBryde

Austin, TX 78753

Defendants

Freedom Mortgage

Stanley C Middleman

Stan Moskowitz

KBHS Home Loans, LLC

LoanCare, LLC

Stearns Lending, LLC

Codilis & Moody, P.C.

Angela Zavala

Nestor Trustee Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Dustin C. George

Attorney at Miller, George & Suggs, PLLC

5601 Democracy Drive, Suite 265

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) REPLY in Support, filed by Freedom Mortgage, Stanley C Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage, #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz, #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (George, Dustin) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

#21

(#21) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#20

(#20) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#17

(#19) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#16

(#18) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

15 #1

Proposed Order

15 #15

Main Document

14 #2

Proposed Order Granting Defendant Freedom Mortgage Corporation's Motion to

14 #1

Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Bankruptcy Filing

14 #14

Main Document

#6

(#6) ORDER setting Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION Injunctive Relief by Aileen McBryde, Anthony McBryde. (pg) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (cc3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#2

Text Order GRANTING #2 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's pro se motion to file electronically is GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #2

Filing fee receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: referred #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stan Moskowitz #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Stanley C Middleman, #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Freedom Mortgage, and #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nestor Trustee Services, LLC. Referral Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (pg) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order REFERRING #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for a report and recommendation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(d) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY in Support, filed by Freedom Mortgage, Stanley C Middleman, Stan Moskowitz, Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage, #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC, #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz, #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (George, Dustin) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Nestor Trustee Services, LLC (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Freedom Mortgage (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stanley C Middleman (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Aileen Name McBryde, Anthony McBryde, re #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Stan Moskowitz (McBryde, Aileen) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER setting Telephone Conference set for 10/27/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/26/2022 02:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #2 Pro Se Motion for Permission to file Electronically entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's pro se motion to file electronically is GRANTED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jllc) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION Injunctive Relief by Aileen McBryde, Anthony McBryde. (pg) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. (pg) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (cc3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Anthony McBryde and Aileen McBryde (cc3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (cc3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Se MOTION for Permission to file Electronically by Anthony McBryde. Motions referred to Judge Dustin M. Howell. (cc3) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 454)filed by Anthony McBryde and Aileen McBryde. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cc3) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2022: #2 Filing fee receipt) (cc3). (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less