This case was last updated from PACER on 05/31/2020 at 08:44:39 (UTC).

McBryar v. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (JRG3)

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 McBryar filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wakefield Associates, Inc JRG3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J Ronnie Greer and H Bruce Guyton. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00140

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Ronnie Greer

Referral Judge

H Bruce Guyton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ray A. McBryar

Defendant

Wakefield & Associates, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan C Lee

Attorney at Alan C. Lee, Attorney

Post Office Box 1357

Talbott, TN 37877-1357

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by Ray A. McBryar (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Ray A. McBryar Trial Date: N/A; Case Reported Settled By Alan C. Lee, Attorney for Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray A. McBryar. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#5

(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

1 #4

Summons - Wakefield

1 #3

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Collection Ltr

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Legal Action

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4291783.), filed by Ray A. McBryar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Legal Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Collection Ltr, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with prejudice as to all remaining Defendants by Ray A. McBryar (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Ray A. McBryar Trial Date: N/A; Case Reported Settled By Alan C. Lee, Attorney for Plaintiff; Parties did not participate in mediation/arbitration. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ray A. McBryar. Wakefield & Associates, Inc. served on 4/6/2020. (Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge J Ronnie Greer on April 2, 2020. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Wakefield & Associates, Inc. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge J Ronnie Greer and Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton added. (AYB) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wakefield & Associates, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4291783.), filed by Ray A. McBryar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Legal Action, #2 Exhibit 2 - Collection Ltr, #3 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Wakefield)(Lee, Alan) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less