This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2021 at 12:15:40 (UTC).

McAuliffe v. Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 McAuliffe filed a Personal Injury - Airplane lawsuit against Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

Referral Judge

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mirna McAuliffe

Thomas McAuliffe

Defendants

Novictor Aviation, LLC a Hawaii Limited Liability Company doing business as Novictor Helicopters also known as Rainbow Helicopters

Avco Corporation

Theresita Terry Berridge

Textron Lycoming Reciprocating Engine Division

Textron, Inc.

Lycoming Engines

Lycoming Engines Division

Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.

Lycoming Engines an Operating Division of Avco Corporation

United Helicopter Leasing, LLC

Rainbow Helicopters

Doe Defendants 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew C. Winter

Attorney at Davis Levin Livingston

851 Fort Street Mall, Suite 400, 524-7500, Fax: 356-0418

Honolulu, HI 96813-4317

Mark S. Davis

Attorney at Davis Levin Livingston Grande

400 Davis Levin Livingston Grande Place, 851 Fort Street Ste 400, 524-7500

Honolulu, HI 96813-4317

Michael K. Livingston

Attorney at Davis Levin Livingston

400 Davis Levin Livingston Place, 851 Fort Street Ste 400, 524-7500, Fax: 545-7802

Honolulu, HI 96813-4317

Joseph A. Power, Jr.

Attorney at Power Rogers, LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 5500

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorney

David J. Hoftiezer

Attorney at Goodsill Anderson Quinn & Stifel LLLP

999 Bishop St Ste 1600, 547-5600

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Helicopter Leasing, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#21

(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novictor Aviation, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

20 #2

Certificate of Service

20 #1

Demand for Jury Trial

#20

(#20) Defendants Novictor Aviation LLC's and United Helicopter Leasing LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Novictor Aviation, LLC, United Helicopter Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

19 #1

Certificate of Service

#19

(#19) OBJECTION re #16 Notice (Other) Notice of Related Cases filed by Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Civil No. 21-cv-00242-JMS-WRP and Civil No. 21-cv-00193-HG-WRP David J. Hoftiezer appearing for Defendant Novictor Aviation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel [David Hoftiezer], #3 Exhibit A [McAuliffe Complaint], #4 Exhibit B [Burgess Complaint], #5 Certificate of Service)(Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Novictor Aviation, LLC NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 21-CV-00242-JMS-WRP AND 21-CV-00193-HG-WRP; EXHIBITS A - B; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Novictor Aviation, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

7 #2

AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons

7 #1

AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons

6 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures

#6

(#6) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#3

(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Mirna McAuliffe. (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

1 #1

Demand for Jury Trial

#1

(#20) Defendants Novictor Aviation LLC's and United Helicopter Leasing LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Novictor Aviation, LLC, United Helicopter Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Helicopter Leasing, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novictor Aviation, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Defendants Novictor Aviation LLC's and United Helicopter Leasing LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Novictor Aviation, LLC, United Helicopter Leasing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) OBJECTION re #16 Notice (Other) Notice of Related Cases filed by Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Winter, Matthew) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Civil No. 21-cv-00242-JMS-WRP and Civil No. 21-cv-00193-HG-WRP David J. Hoftiezer appearing for Defendant Novictor Aviation, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel [David Hoftiezer], #3 Exhibit A [McAuliffe Complaint], #4 Exhibit B [Burgess Complaint], #5 Certificate of Service)(Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • Docket(#17) EO: Based on Plaintiffs' request, the Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2021 to 8/9/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY-Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDF'S - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #16 Notice of Related Cases are comprised of several exhibits and not submitted as separate pdf attachments. See Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action needed. (jo) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Novictor Aviation, LLC NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 21-CV-00242-JMS-WRP AND 21-CV-00193-HG-WRP; EXHIBITS A - B; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Novictor Aviation, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe. Avco Corporation served on 5/19/2021. (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe. Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc. served on 5/25/2021. (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JOSEPH A. POWER, JR. re: #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/22/2021. JOSEPH A. POWER, JR. (Firm: Power Rogers, LLP) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs (jo) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Document #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice includes a proposed order that requires the judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the document to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jo) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Re Joseph A. Powers, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2513935.Mark S. Davis appearing for Plaintiffs Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00193 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Mirna McAuliffe. (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons (Proposed) (Davis, Mark) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against Mirna McAuliffe All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2513344.), filed by Mirna McAuliffe, Thomas McAuliffe . (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(Davis, Mark) Modified on 4/20/2021 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LYCOMING ENGINES, A DIVISION OF AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AVCO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC. is a litigant