This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2020 at 07:19:25 (UTC).

MCARTHUR v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MCARTHUR filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kathleen M. Williams and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-24858

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kathleen M. Williams

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELLIOTT MCARTHUR

Punta Gorda, FL 33955

Defendant

SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Brian Hernan Zack

Attorney at State of Florida - Office of the Attorney General

1 Se 3Rd Avenue, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO RESPONDENT. Respondent shall file the written notice in accordance with the Courts Order to Show Cause immediately, but at the very least no later than 9:00 AM on Monday, December 9, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

18 #1

Transcripts 7-26-1996 Plea Hearing Transcript

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Hernan Zack on behalf of SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Attorney Brian Hernan Zack added to party SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS(pty:dft). (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#11

(#11) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS of Filing State Trial Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Transcripts 7-26-1996 Plea Hearing Transcript) (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#1

ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#2

(#7) PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Doc. #2 , is deferred for ruling. The clerk shall forward to Petitioner the prisoner consent form portion of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or submit an executed and completed prisoner consent form. Fee/Consent Form due by 11/22/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/23/2019. (form to Pet) (sdw) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#4

Set Deadlines re #4 Order. Financial Consent form/Filing Fee due by 10/21/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#17

(#17) APPENDIX by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

No Description Available

#15

(#15) NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS of Filing State Trial Transcripts (Attachments: #1 Transcripts 7-26-1996 Plea Hearing Transcript) (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPENDIX by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix)(Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Hernan Zack on behalf of SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. Attorney Brian Hernan Zack added to party SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS(pty:dft). (Zack, Brian) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO RESPONDENT. Respondent shall file the written notice in accordance with the Courts Order to Show Cause immediately, but at the very least no later than 9:00 AM on Monday, December 9, 2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order, Respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • (#10) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (jua) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00487. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua). (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PRISONER CONSENT & FINANCIAL CERTIFICATE by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sdw) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF Doc. #2 , is deferred for ruling. The clerk shall forward to Petitioner the prisoner consent form portion of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or submit an executed and completed prisoner consent form. Fee/Consent Form due by 11/22/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/23/2019. (form to Pet) (sdw) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw) Modified on 10/23/2019 to terminate motion (sdw). (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines re #4 Order. Financial Consent form/Filing Fee due by 10/21/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER deferring ruling on #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall forward to Petitioner the prisoner consent form portion of the form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, Petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or submit an executed and completed prisoner consent form. After the expiration of fourteen (14) days, the Court will consider the motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF Doc. #2 ). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON on 10/7/2019. (form to Pet) (sdw) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Referred to HOPE T CANNON. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • (#3) Notice to Pro Se litigant ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by ELLIOTT MCARTHUR. (no service copies) (sdw) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.