This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:47:32 (UTC).

McArthur v. 16 Lombard St LLC

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 McArthur filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against 16 Lombard St LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stefan R. Underhill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01007

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stefan R. Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alexander McArthur

New Haven, CT 06513

Defendant

16 Lombard St LLC

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, OPTD, Electronic Filing Order, Standing Protective Order, Order granting the IFP motion, Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, Consent to electronic notice by pro se litigant, Motion by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Alexander McArthur, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alexander McArthur, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2020.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020 Discovery due by 1/16/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander McArthur. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #1

Notice of Manually Filed Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Property Management 16 Lombard St LLC, filed by Alexander McArthur. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manually Filed Exhibits)(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, OPTD, Electronic Filing Order, Standing Protective Order, Order granting the IFP motion, Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, Consent to electronic notice by pro se litigant, Motion by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Alexander McArthur, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alexander McArthur, #5 Protective Order, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2020.(Oliver, T.) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 McArthur's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. McArthur has recently filed two dozen cases that are all pending before me. In each of those cases, McArthur has made a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Although McArthur does not include all relevant information in any one motion, I glean from all those motions that McArthur has been unemployed since 2009, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Yale New Haven Hospital, et al., No. 3:20-cv-998, has little-to-no real or personal property of value, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Cargil, et al., No. 3:20-cv-967, earns his only income, $783 per month, from social security, see id., and has monthly obligations totaling at least $343, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Alexis, et al., No. 3:20-cv-1159 (notably, that total does not include monthly expenditures on food and clothing). At this stage, McArthur's allegations are sufficient to establish that he is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. s. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, McArthur's motion to leave to proceed in forma pauperis, doc. no. #2 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 09/04/2020. (Rosenberg, J.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/15/2020 Discovery due by 1/16/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/20/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/17/2020.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander McArthur. (Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Property Management 16 Lombard St LLC, filed by Alexander McArthur. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Manually Filed Exhibits)(Freberg, B) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less