This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:48:03 (UTC).

McAllister Towing of New York, LLC v. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 McAllister Towing of New York, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Epic Applied Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02054

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McAllister Towing of New York, LLC

Defendant

Epic Applied Technologies, LLC

Garnishee

Bank of America, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Stephen Simms

Attorney at Simms Showers LLP

201 International Circle, Suite 250

Baltimore, MD 21030

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#12

(#12) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#11

(#11) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

10 #1

PMAG - BofA

#10

(#10) APPLICATION for Writ of MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Request for Additional Issue of Writ per Court's Order [ECF 6] (Attachments: #1 PMAG - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#8

(#8) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment - BofA

3 #1

Memorandum in Support

#3

(#3) MOTION for Order Authorizing Issuance of Writs of Maritime Attachment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

3 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. Epic Applied Technologies, LLC served on 8/19/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Delivery Confirmation)(Simms, J) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION for Writ of MARITIME ATTACHMENT AND GARNISHMENT Request for Additional Issue of Writ per Court's Order [ECF 6] (Attachments: #1 PMAG - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Writ of Garnishment Executed.(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WRIT of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment issued (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER for Appointment of Service of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER for Issue of Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/15/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Epic Applied Technologies, LLC.(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Appointment for Service of Writ of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Order Authorizing Issuance of Writs of Maritime Attachment by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Process of Maritime Attachment & Garnishment - BofA)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC (Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A., Epic Applied Technologies, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8121564.), filed by McAllister Towing of New York, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Simms, J) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.