This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/05/2022 at 11:26:08 (UTC).

McAboy v. Intel Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 McAboy filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Intel Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karin J. Immergut. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01773

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karin J. Immergut

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edward McAboy

Defendants

Intel Corporation

Brian Lemme

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyann C. Kalin

Attorney at Stutheit Kalin LLC

1 Sw Columbia Street, Suite 1850

Portland, OR 97204

Maria Witt

Attorney at Stutheit Kaln LLC

1 Sw Columbia Street, Suite 1850

Portland, OR 97258

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Copple

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

200 Sw Market St., Ste. 540

Portland, OR 97201

Sarah J. Ryan

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

200 Sw Market Street, Suite 540

Portland, OR 97201

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) Declaration of Anthony Copple . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#11

(#11) Declaration of Lei Hart . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#10

(#10) Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/27/2022) (cw). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#8

(#8) Declaration of Anthony Copple . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #7 .) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) Declaration of Maria Witt in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#5

(#5) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice of Appearance of Maria Witt appearing on behalf of Edward McAboy. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/7/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/9/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 5/9/2022. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21cv45802 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8333320 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #10 Response to Motion. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The signature line was incorrect. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Declaration of Anthony Copple . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Declaration of Lei Hart . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Main Document 10 replaced on 1/27/2022) (cw). (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: Finding good cause, this Court GRANTS the unopposed motion for extension, #7 . Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand will now be due January 21, 2021. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jy) (Entered: 01/19/2022). (jy) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Declaration of Anthony Copple . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to a Motion #7 .) (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration of Maria Witt in Support of Motion to Remand. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #5 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance of Maria Witt appearing on behalf of Edward McAboy. Filed by Edward McAboy. (Witt, Maria) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Intel Corporation. (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/7/2022. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/9/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 5/9/2022. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (joha) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal of Case Number 21cv45802 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8333320 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Intel Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Copple, Anthony) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Intel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Copple