This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2020 at 10:31:09 (UTC).

MBA Engineering Inc et al v. Matrix Trust Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2020 MBA Engineering Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Matrix Trust Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01915

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MBA Engineering Inc Cash Balance Plan

Craig Meidinger

MBA Engineering Inc

MBA Engineering Inc 401(k) Plan

Defendants

Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC

Matrix Trust Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Neal Bryan

Attorney at McCathern, PLLC

3710 Rawlins, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75229

David A Dekle

Attorney at McCathern PLLC

3710 Rawlins Street, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

Hossain Arnold Shokouhi

Attorney at McCathern Mooty LLP

3710 Rawlins, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75219

Evan Selik

Attorney at McCathern LLP

523 W Sixth Street, Suite 830

Los Angeles, CA 90014

Defendant Attorneys

David I Monteiro

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

1717 Main St, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Abbey M Glenn

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Justin Roel Chapa

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3200

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert A Lewis

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

One Market Street, Spear Tower

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing

#14

12 #1

Exhibit(s) Certificate

#12

#11

#10

#9

7 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

7 #1

Attachment A

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Abbey M. Glenn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/14/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Abbey M. Glenn (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11164606) filed by Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC, Matrix Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) (Chapa, Justin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert A. Lewis. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 8/6/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11052564) filed by Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC, Matrix Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate)Attorney Robert A Lewis added to party Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert A Lewis added to party Matrix Trust Company(pty:dft) (Lewis, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin Roel Chapa on behalf of Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC, Matrix Trust Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Chapa, Justin) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David I Monteiro on behalf of Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC, Matrix Trust Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Monteiro, David) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC. Waiver sent on 7/24/2020; Matrix Trust Company. Waiver sent on 7/24/2020. (Bryan, Justin) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Evan Selik. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 7/24/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Evan Selik (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11018555) filed by MBA Engineering Inc, MBA Engineering Inc 401(k) Plan, MBA Engineering Inc Cash Balance Plan, Craig Meidinger (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Matrix Settlement & Clearance Services LLC, Matrix Trust Company. (hml) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MBA Engineering Inc and MBA Engineering Inc Cash Balance Plan. (Shokouhi, Hossain) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MBA Engineering Inc, MBA Engineering Inc 401(k) Plan, MBA Engineering Inc Cash Balance Plan. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by MBA Engineering Inc, MBA Engineering Inc 401(k) Plan, MBA Engineering Inc Cash Balance Plan. (Shokouhi, Hossain) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs filed by MBA Engineering Inc, MBA Engineering Inc. Cash Balance Plan, MBA Engineering Inc 401(k) Plan. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11010959) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Shokouhi, Hossain) Modified text on 7/21/2020 (hml). (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Matrix Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Justin Neal Bryan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hossain Arnold Shokouhi

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Selik, NCAED