This case was last updated from PACER on 05/11/2021 at 09:08:18 (UTC).

M.B. et al v. New York City Department of Education et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 M B filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02203

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M.B.

Defendants

New York City Board of Education

New York City Department of Educatiion

Chancellor Richard Carranza in His Official Capacity

New York City Department of Education

Chancellor Richard Carranza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Erin Michelle O'Connor

Attorney at The Law Office of Elisa Hyman, P.C.

1115 Broadway, Ste 12Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

Defendant Attorney

Brian Joseph Krist

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER: granting in part nunc pro tunc #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's application is untimely per Individual Rule I.B.2, but nevertheless is GRANTED in part nunc pro tunc. Defendant's deadline to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 24, 2021. The May 13, 2021, initial conference is adjourned to June 17, 2021, at 10:50 a.m. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/12/2021) (ama) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#14

(#14) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond and to Adjourn Initial Conference, on Consent addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian Krist dated April 9, 2021. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Board of Education, New York City Department of Education..(Krist, Brian) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/2/2021) (cf) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Richard Carranza served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Board of Education served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Department of Education served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Carranza. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Board of Education. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#1

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Richard Carranza answer due 5/24/2021; New York City Board of Education answer due 5/24/2021; New York City Department of Education answer due 5/24/2021., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 6/17/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (ama) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: granting in part nunc pro tunc #14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's application is untimely per Individual Rule I.B.2, but nevertheless is GRANTED in part nunc pro tunc. Defendant's deadline to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 24, 2021. The May 13, 2021, initial conference is adjourned to June 17, 2021, at 10:50 a.m. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. No. 14. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/12/2021) (ama) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond and to Adjourn Initial Conference, on Consent addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Brian Krist dated April 9, 2021. Document filed by Richard Carranza, New York City Board of Education, New York City Department of Education..(Krist, Brian) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Proof of Service of Order. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself), M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Receipt).(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 5/13/2021 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The conference will be telephonic. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/2/2021) (cf) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Richard Carranza served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Board of Education served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City Department of Education served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by email. Document filed by M.B.(on behalf of herself); M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Carranza. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Board of Education. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Erin Michelle O'Connor. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M.B.; New York City Department of Education; Richard Carranza. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Chancellor Richard Carranza in his Official Capacity, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Board of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chancellor Richard Carranza in His Official Capacity, New York City Board of Education, New York City Department of Educatiion. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24246452)Document filed by M.B., M.B.(on behalf of her child, M.B.1)..(O'Connor, Erin) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where New York City Board of Education is a litigant

Latest cases where M.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where New York City Department of Education is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Michelle O'Connor