This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 05:47:10 (UTC).

M.B. et al v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 M B filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05882

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

M.B.

Russell Barbone

Defendants

JUUL Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

Adam Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Eby-Brown Company, LLC

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher G. Paulos

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien

316 South Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Matthew D. Schultz

Attorney at Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien

316 South Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

Ned McWilliams

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Rafferty Proctor Buchanan O'Brien Barr

316 S Baylen Street, Suite 600

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

2 #1

A - Defendant List

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 A - Defendant List)(Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Alternative Ingredients Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16236028). Filed by Russell Barbone, M.B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDIRECT FILE MEMBER CASE OPENED: re: 3:19-md-2913, M.B. et al v. JuuL Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-5882-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 A - Defendant List)(Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2021) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and JURY DEMAND against Alternative Ingredients Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Eby-Brown Company, LLC, Hoyoung Huh, JUUL Labs, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16236028). Filed by Russell Barbone, M.B.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paulos, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2021) Modified on 8/2/2021 (slhS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where M.B. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Alternative Ingredients, Inc. is a litigant