This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2019 at 05:46:18 (UTC).

Mazo Morales v. El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Mazo Morales filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joan A. Lenard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-25101

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan A. Lenard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Amalia Mazo Morales

Defendants

El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp.

Heidi Perez Castaneda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lisa Kuhlman Tietig

Attorney at JH Zidell, PA

Suite 605, 300 71St Street, Suite 605, Miami Beach

Miami Beach, FL 33141

Defendant Attorney

Ena Teresa Diaz

Attorney at Ena T. Diaz, P.A.

999 Ponce De Leon Blvd., Suite 720

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) Statement of: Claim by Maria Amalia Mazo Morales re #15 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Tietig, Lisa) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Daniel T. Feld. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 4/22/2020 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Daniel T Feld as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for April 22, 2020 @ 10:00 a.m. (Niad Hannah, Cindy) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

18 #1

Appendix

#18

(#18) ORDER of Referral to Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2020. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#17

(#17) Order Adopting Joint Scheduling Report, Setting Pretrial Conference and Trial, Establishing Pretrial Deadlines, and Establishing Pretrial and Trial Procedures: Jury Trial set for 11/23/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Calendar Call set for 11/18/2020 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#16

(#16) Order Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (mms) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#15

(#15) Notice of Court Procedure in Actions Brought Under The Fair Labor Standards Act and Referral to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit Joint Scheduling Form

#4

(#4) Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/12/19. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

3 #2

Appendix

3 #1

Appendix

#3

(#5) CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan re: DE #3 for Discovery Disputes. (jmd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C Notice to State Court of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B Returns of Service on Defendants

1 #1

Exhibit A Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint Under 29 U.S.C. 201-216 Overtime Wage Violations) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12217405, filed by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda. No answer/motion to dismiss filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Returns of Service on Defendants, #3 Exhibit C Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz, Ena) Modified text on 12/11/2019 (mc). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Statement of: Claim by Maria Amalia Mazo Morales re #15 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, (Tietig, Lisa) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Daniel T. Feld. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 4/22/2020 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Daniel T Feld as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for April 22, 2020 @ 10:00 a.m. (Niad Hannah, Cindy) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER of Referral to Mediation and Directing Plaintiff's Counsel to Submit (Within Fourteen Days) Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation. Mediation Deadline 5/28/2020. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (dp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Order Adopting Joint Scheduling Report, Setting Pretrial Conference and Trial, Establishing Pretrial Deadlines, and Establishing Pretrial and Trial Procedures: Jury Trial set for 11/23/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Calendar Call set for 11/18/2020 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Joan A. Lenard. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 01/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (mms) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Notice of Court Procedure in Actions Brought Under The Fair Labor Standards Act and Referral to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Maria Amalia Mazo Morales (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Exhibit Joint Non-Consent to Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge)(Tietig, Lisa) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda (Diaz, Ena) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Striking #11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions filed by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda (Diaz, Ena) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Maria Amalia Mazo Morales (Tietig, Lisa) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Maria Amalia Mazo Morales (Tietig, Lisa) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda identifying Other Affiliate Maria De Los Angeles Lazo De La Vega for El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp. (Diaz, Ena) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT (Removal) by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (State), #2 Complaint, #3 proposed Summons to El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., #4 proposed Summons to Heidi Perez Castaneda, #5 issued Summons to El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., #6 issued Summons to Heidi Perez Castaneda, #7 Return of Service on El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., #8 Return of Service on Heidi Perez Castaneda, #9 Notice to State Court of Removal)(Diaz, Ena) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda. (Diaz, Ena) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CASE REFERRED to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan re: DE #3 for Discovery Disputes. (jmd) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Forth the Court's Policy on Motions for Extension or Stay of the Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/12/19. See attached document for full details. (dp) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Referring Discovery Disputes and Certain Pretrial Motions to Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan; Directing Parties to File Certificates of Interested Parties; Directing Parties to File a Notice of Refiling And/or of Related Cases; Requiring Completion of Form Consenting to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge; Notice of Court Practice in Removal Actions; and Directing Parties to File a Joint Scheduling Report and Form. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 12/12/19. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Appendix) (dp) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mc) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint Under 29 U.S.C. 201-216 Overtime Wage Violations) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12217405, filed by El Indio Bakery and Cafeteria Corp., Heidi Perez Castaneda. No answer/motion to dismiss filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Returns of Service on Defendants, #3 Exhibit C Notice to State Court of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz, Ena) Modified text on 12/11/2019 (mc). (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.