This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 12:30:49 (UTC).

Mazal Saada et al v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Mazal Saada filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04250

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.

Mazal Saada

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Encore Capital Group, Inc.

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amir J. Goldstein

Attorney at Law Offices Amir Goldstein

7034 Beverly Boulevard Suite 212

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant Attorneys

Cheryl S Chang

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Saam Takaloo

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Summons as to Defendant Encore Capital Group, Inc.

#8

#9

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RE

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES by Judge George H. Wu re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #10 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants, MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. and ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC.'s time to respond to Plaintif's Class Action Complaint For Damages, served June 2, 2021, is extended from July 23, 2021 to and including August 23, 2021. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer now due 8/23/2021; Encore Capital Group, Inc. answer now due 8/23/2021, re Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #9 filed by defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES)(Takaloo, Saam) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Encore Capital Group, Inc. answer now due 7/23/2021; Midland Credit Management, Inc. answer now due 7/23/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc.; Midland Credit Management, Inc..(Attorney Saam Takaloo added to party Encore Capital Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Saam Takaloo added to party Midland Credit Management, Inc.(pty:dft))(Takaloo, Saam) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Encore Capital Group, Inc., Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Defendant Encore Capital Group, Inc.) (lh) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Mazal Saada, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request #2)(Goldstein, Amir) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mazal Saada, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated., (Goldstein, Amir) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mazal Saada, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Goldstein, Amir) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31335147 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Mazal Saada, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.. (Attorney Amir J. Goldstein added to party Mazal Saada(pty:pla), Attorney Amir J. Goldstein added to party individually and on behalf of others similarly situated.(pty:pla))(Goldstein, Amir) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCORE CAPITAL GROUP, INC., a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE CHARLES P WALKER TRUST UAD MAY 10 1991 AS AMENDED is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cheryl S Chang