This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:25:12 (UTC).

Mays v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Mays filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robin L. Rosenberg and Bruce E. Reinhart. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-80095

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robin L. Rosenberg

Referral Judge

Bruce E. Reinhart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura A. Mays

Defendants

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

900 Ridgebury Road

Ridgefield, CT 06877

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

55 Corporate Drive

Bridgewater, NJ 08807-1265

Pfizer, Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Louis Haberman

Attorney at Schlesinger Law Offices

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Jonathan Gdanski

Attorney at Sheldon J. Schlesinger PA

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

Scott P. Schlesinger

Attorney at Sheldon J. Schlesinger PA

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33316

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Docket(#4) MDL Tag-Along Case Receipt from Southern District of Florida. Case Number 9:22-cv-80095-RLR Mays v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al with documents 1-3. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketCases associated 9:20-md-2924-RLR. (mc) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 1/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15325851, filed by Laura A. Mays. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Inc Pfizer is a litigant