This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 09:30:16 (UTC).

Perkins v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 Perkins filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Defendants

Federal Bureau of Prisons

John P Yates

Hess

Mars

S Amuimuia

Howard

Williams

Roberts

Westbrook

Avant

Winbush

Briggs

Eason

Laim

Mayberry

Moore

Dixon

Wallace

Edge

20 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Larry Perkins.(kdr) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #1 Complaint be dismissed, without prejudice; and recommending that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #1 Complaint be dismissed, without prejudice; and recommending that the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Recommendation and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due within 14 days of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/1/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within thirty days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/30/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Larry Perkins.(kdr) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eason is a litigant

Latest cases where Mayberry is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. WALLACE is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTBROOK is a litigant