This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/18/2022 at 07:38:03 (UTC).

Mays et al v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 Mays filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kristine G. Baker and Jerome T. Kearney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Otis Mays

Talladega, AL 35160

Defendants

Federal Bureau of Prisons

John P Yates

Hess

Mars

S Amuimuia

Howard

Williams

Roberts

Westbrook

Avant

Winbush

Briggs

Eason

Laim

Mayberry

Moore

Dixon

Wallace

Edge

19 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Otis Mays.(kdr) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address and MOTION for Copies by Otis Mays (kbc) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/19/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this case, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/19/2022. (llg) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays. (llg) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Warden of the FCI Talladega Federal Correctional Institution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Order by Otis Mays. (ldb) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#8

(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/08/2022. (lmc) (Docket text modified on 11/9/2022 to correct the signature date) (jak) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; directing the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form; and directing Plaintiff to identify by name the Lieutenant referred to in Plaintiffs deliberate indifference to serious medical needs claim and to file an Amended Complaint, if he wishes, consistent with the instructions in this Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/08/2022. (llg) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the signature date as 11/8/2022 as marked on the Order. (jak) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion for Order; directing the Clerk of the Court to mail Plaintiff a blank 42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint form; and directing Plaintiff to identify by name the Lieutenant referred to in Plaintiffs deliberate indifference to serious medical needs claim and to file an Amended Complaint, if he wishes, consistent with the instructions in this Order within 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/08/2022. (llg) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/08/2022. (lmc) (Docket text modified on 11/9/2022 to correct the signature date) (jak) (Entered: 11/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Order by Otis Mays. (ldb) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's prison trust account for the $350 filing fee; and directing the Clerk to forward a copy of this Order to the Warden of the FCI Talladega Federal Correctional Institution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/2/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 11/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Otis Mays. (llg) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Copies; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet in this case, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/19/2022. (llg) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit either the $402 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send to Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/19/2022. (ldb) (Entered: 10/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address and MOTION for Copies by Otis Mays (kbc) (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Otis Mays.(kdr) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Eason is a litigant

Latest cases where Mayberry is a litigant

Latest cases where DR. WALLACE is a litigant

Latest cases where WESTBROOK is a litigant