This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2022 at 08:15:38 (UTC).

Mayes v. Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Mayes filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Suzanne Mitchell and Robin J. Cauthron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Suzanne Mitchell

Presiding Judge

Robin J. Cauthron

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Lawrence L Mayes

Hominy, OK 74035

Respondents

Department of Corrections

Records Offices

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Envelope

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Envelope

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lawrence L Mayes. The undersigned recommends the dismissal of this case for lack of jurisdiction. The undersigned further recommends Petitioner's #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lawrence L Mayes, be denied as moot. Petitioner's #7 MOTION for Order filed by Lawrence L Mayes should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2022. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/16/22. (lb) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

7 #1

Envelope

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Exhibit 1- Transaction List

5 #5

Main Document

1 #11

Envelope

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Response from Administrative Review Authority

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Grievance Decision from Reviewing Authority

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Interoffice Memorandum

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Inmate Grievance

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Request to Staff

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - WestLaw Excerpts

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Oklahoma State Department of Corrections Inmate Information

1 #1

Main Document

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Object and Motion to Change Venue, jurisdiction and venue to the District Court of Oklahoma County Under Rule 12 OK Stat, 12-140.1. (2014)" by Lawrence L Mayes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE titled, "Rule FRCVP25 Disclousure and Discovery" by Lawrence L Mayes (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lawrence L Mayes. The undersigned recommends the dismissal of this case for lack of jurisdiction. The undersigned further recommends Petitioner's #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lawrence L Mayes, be denied as moot. Petitioner's #7 MOTION for Order filed by Lawrence L Mayes should be denied. Objections to R&R due by 3/9/2022. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell on 2/16/22. (lb) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Order titled, "Motion to Object to Characterize Petitioner's Petition as a Motion Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2254" by Lawrence L Mayes. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE (other) by Lawrence L Mayes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - OK County Documents, #2 Envelope)(jjs) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence L Mayes. Motions referred to Suzanne Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Transaction List, #2 Envelope)(so) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Suzanne Mitchell. Entered by direction of Judge Robin J. Cauthron on 01/07/2022. (km) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Robin J. Cauthron for all further proceedings. Judge Jodi W. Dishman no longer assigned to case. Entered by direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 01/07/2022. (km) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PREVIOUS Cases. (km) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lawrence L Mayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brief and Facts, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Judgment and Sentence, #3 Exhibit 3 - Oklahoma State Department of Corrections Inmate Information, #4 Exhibit 4 - WestLaw Excerpts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Request to Staff, #6 Exhibit 6 - Inmate Grievance, #7 Exhibit 7 - Interoffice Memorandum, #8 Exhibit 8 - Grievance Decision from Reviewing Authority, #9 Exhibit 9 - Grievance Appeal to Administrative Review Authority, #10 Exhibit 10 - Response from Administrative Review Authority, #11 Envelope)(km) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Record is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPT. OF CORRECTIONS REHAB. K.V.S.P. is a litigant