This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2022 at 07:22:30 (UTC).

Mayes v. City of Boonville, Missouri

Case Summary

On 05/11/2022 Mayes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Boonville, Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Willie J. Epps, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04071

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Willie J. Epps, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charissa Mayes

Defendant

City of Boonville, Missouri

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony Meyer

Attorney at Lear & Werts, LLP

103 Ripley Street

Columbia, MO 65201

Bradford B. Lear

Attorney at Lear & Werts, LLP

103 Ripley Street

Columbia, MO 65201

Todd C. Werts

Attorney at Lear & Werts, LLP

103 Ripley Street

Columbia, MO 65201

Defendant Attorney

Jill Waldman

Attorney at Lathrop GPM LLP

2345 Grand Avenue, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Charge of discrimination

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of right to sue

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Charissa Mayes. City of Boonville, Missouri served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Werts, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT on behalf of City of Boonville, Missouri.(Attorney Jill Waldman added to party City of Boonville, Missouri(pty:dft))(Waldman, Jill) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Magistrate Consent

#7

(#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/5/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 7/15/2022. The parties must follow the formatting of Judge Epps' example scheduling and trial order posted at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/epps. Signed on 6/6/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Anthony Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Charissa Mayes.(Meyer, Anthony) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#9

(#9) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Frank Neuner(Meyer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jill Waldman on behalf of Defendant City of Boonville, Missouri.(Waldman, Jill) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Jill Waldman on behalf of Defendant City of Boonville, Missouri.(Waldman, Jill) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Frank Neuner(Meyer, Anthony) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Anthony Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Charissa Mayes.(Meyer, Anthony) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/5/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 7/15/2022. The parties must follow the formatting of Judge Epps' example scheduling and trial order posted at https://www.mow.uscourts.gov/judges/epps. Signed on 6/6/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Magistrate Judge Assignment Returned by plaintiff, Charissa Mayes and defendant, City of Boonville, Missouri. Jurisdiction by magistrate judge accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT on behalf of City of Boonville, Missouri.(Attorney Jill Waldman added to party City of Boonville, Missouri(pty:dft))(Waldman, Jill) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Charissa Mayes. City of Boonville, Missouri served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Werts, Todd) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED as to City of Boonville, Missouri. Summons directed to plaintiff for service. (Warren, Melissa) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 5/11/2022 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Kaitlin) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 6/1/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Berner, Crystal) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Boonville, Missouri filed by Anthony Meyer on behalf of Charissa Mayes. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7927403. Service due by 8/9/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of discrimination, #2 Exhibit Notice of right to sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, Anthony) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jill Waldman