This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/10/2022 at 08:54:17 (UTC).

Mayberry v. Rausch Sturm LLP

Case Summary

On 02/09/2022 Mayberry filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Rausch Sturm LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa L. Bryant. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00240

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa L. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sara Mayberry

Defendants

Rausch Sturm, LLP

Rausch Sturm LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael W. Kennedy

Attorney at The Kennedy Law Firm

103 Mile Creek Road, 06371

Old Lyme, CT 06371

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1-3

1 #2

Exhibit Civil Cover

1 #3

Exhibit Summons

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sara Mayberry. (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2022; Discovery due by 8/11/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#7

(#7) ENTERED IN ERROR -- NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Mayberry, #1 Complaint filed by Sara Mayberry, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/22. (Velez, F.) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Shafer, J.). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #7 Electronic Service Documents. Signed by Clerk on 2-14-2022. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#10

(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Rausch Sturm LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael W. Kennedy* *The Kennedy Law Firm* *103 Mile Creek Road* *Old Lyme, CT 06371*. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Sara Mayberry (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled. Plaintiff has informed the Court that this case has settled. See Dkt. #11 Notice of Settlement. This dismissal is without prejudice to re-opening on or before 70 days following this order. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal for approval by the Court or simply for inclusion in the Court's file, they may do so on or before 70 days following this order. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/1/2022. (Burlingham, Corinne) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Sara Mayberry (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Rausch Sturm LLP* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael W. Kennedy* *The Kennedy Law Firm* *103 Mile Creek Road* *Old Lyme, CT 06371*. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #7 Electronic Service Documents. Signed by Clerk on 2-14-2022. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/14/2022. (Burlingham, Corinne) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry Correction: #7 Notice to Counsel entered in error. (Shafer, J.) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTERED IN ERROR -- NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Standing Protective Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sara Mayberry, #1 Complaint filed by Sara Mayberry, #6 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 2/10/22. (Velez, F.) Modified on 2/11/2022 (Shafer, J.). (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/10/2022; Discovery due by 8/11/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2022. Signed by Clerk on 2/9/22. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketJudge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sara Mayberry. (Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Rausch Sturm, LLP, filed by Sara Mayberry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Kennedy, Michael) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rausch Sturm Israel Enerson & Hornik L L P is a litigant