This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 11:14:10 (UTC).

May v. State of Wisconsin

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 May filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against State of Wisconsin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00948

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edith Mae May

Fond Du Lac, WI 54936-3100

Defendant

State of Wisconsin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#8

RESTRICTED

7 #1

Exhibits

#7

(#7) LETTER re inmate trust account statement from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)

#6

(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that by the end of the day on August 28, 2020, May must file a certified copy of her trust account statement covering the six-month period preceding the filing of her complaint. If she fails to do so, her case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to her based on her failure to diligently prosecute it. (cc: all counsel,via US Mail to Plaintiff)(ds)

5 #1

Exhibits

#5

(#5) LETTER from Plaintiff re summary judgment and legal loan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020-Exhbits scanned in color) (ds). Modified on 7/27/2020 (ds). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Edith Mae May (vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Edith Mae May (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff. (asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) LETTER re inmate trust account statement from plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, that by the end of the day on August 28, 2020, May must file a certified copy of her trust account statement covering the six-month period preceding the filing of her complaint. If she fails to do so, her case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to her based on her failure to diligently prosecute it. (cc: all counsel,via US Mail to Plaintiff)(ds)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER from Plaintiff re summary judgment and legal loan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020-Exhbits scanned in color) (ds). Modified on 7/27/2020 (ds). (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Edith Mae May. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by plaintiff Edith Mae May (vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Edith Mae May (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vkb) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less