This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 07:38:02 (UTC).

May v. Makita U.S.A., Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 May filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Makita U S A , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00079

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas May

Defendant

Makita U.S.A., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Douglas Anderson

Attorney at HUMPHREY AND FARRINGTON

221 W. Lexington, Suite 400

Independence, MO 64050

Jonathan Mesle Soper

Attorney at HUMPHREY AND FARRINGTON

221 W. Lexington, Suite 400

Independence, MO 64050

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-9341572, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Thomas May.(Anderson, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Waiver of Service

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan Mesle Soper for Plaintiff Thomas May. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Jonathan Mesle Soper for Plaintiff Thomas May. (Soper, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Supplement against defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc.; Main document: Original Filing Form; Jury Demand,, filed by Thomas May. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of Service)(Anderson, Paul) Modified on 6/13/2022 (CMH). (Entered: 06/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (MRS) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant Makita U.S.A., Inc. with receipt number AMOEDC-9341572, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Thomas May.(Anderson, Paul) (Entered: 06/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAKITA U.S.A. LNC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan M. Soper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Douglas Anderson