This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2020 at 15:43:04 (UTC).

MAY v. CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 MAY filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephanie L. Haines. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00109

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephanie L. Haines

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRY MAY

Defendant

CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily E. Town

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Third Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Katelyn W. McCombs

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Robert W. Cameron

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Sarah J. Miley

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC - Defendant's response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before 9/9/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 8/7/2020. (dlg) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Miley on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Cameron on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (Cameron, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC Answer due from CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC on 9/9/2020. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARRY MAY. CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of HARRY MAY. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (gpr) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC (cel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5666987), filed by HARRY MAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer filed by CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC - Defendant's response to the Complaint shall be filed on or before 9/9/2020. IT IS SO ORDERED, Signed by Judge Stephanie L. Haines on 8/7/2020. (dlg) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J. Miley on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (Miley, Sarah) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Cameron on behalf of CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC. (Cameron, Robert) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC Answer due from CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC on 9/9/2020. (McCombs, Katelyn) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by HARRY MAY. CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC waiver sent on 6/11/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of HARRY MAY. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (gpr) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC (cel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CORSA WILSON CREEK ENERGY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5666987), filed by HARRY MAY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cel) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. Cordes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily E. Town Esq.