This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2023 at 09:04:34 (UTC).

May v. Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 May filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00271

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kenneth Alan May

Defendant

Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory Francis Ellis

Russell B Robertson

Defendant Attorneys

Allison B Chandler

David J Canupp

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER - Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #17 ). Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/26/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#20

(#20) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/26/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. The telephone conference set for 4/26/2013 is CANCELLED. (KAM) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

#18

(#18) Brief re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

17 #2

Exhibit B

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#13

(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of, filed by Kenneth Alan May.(Robertson, Russell) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#11

(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. To the extent that a reply is needed, Defendant may file such reply on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/03/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER that parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 27, 2023; parties are directed to use the magistrate judge consent form on the CM/ECF system to elect or decline the exercise of magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#4

(#4) Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

3 #2

Exhibit B - June 25, 2015 Regulations

3 #1

Exhibit A - November 8, 2005 Regulations

#3

(#14) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed an #13 amended complaint. Accordingly, the #3 motion to dismiss the original complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/11/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of Filing Notice of Removal (Canupp, David) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4290816. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of from Walker County Circuit Court, case number 2023-900015., filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Canupp, David) NDAL rec# B-4165 Modified on 3/13/2023 (KAM). (Entered: 03/10/2023)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) ORDER - Before the Court is Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #17 ). Plaintiff has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond to the Motion. Defendant will thereafter have seven (7) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/26/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/26/2023. (MEB2) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable L. Scott Coogler. Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden no longer assigned to the case. The telephone conference set for 4/26/2013 is CANCELLED. (KAM) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) Brief re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 04/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference number was incorrect in the court's earlier order. This order REPLACES that order. A telephone conference is SET for 10:00 AM on 04/26/2023 regarding the consent process. The parties are directed to dial 205-931-0422 and the phone conference ID is 535 366 789. The parties should call in no less than five minutes before the start of the call. If the parties encounter technical problems connecting to the call, please contact chambers directly. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/19/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

Docket(#15) TEXT ORDER: A telephone conference is SET for 10:00 AM on 04/26/2023 regarding the consent process. The parties are directed to dial 205-933-0422 and the phone conference ID is 535 366 789. The parties should call in no less than five minutes before the start of the call. If the parties encounter technical problems connecting to the call, please contact chambers directly. The telephone conference will be cancelled by separate order if all parties submit forms 24 hours in advance of the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/19/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/19/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff filed an #13 amended complaint. Accordingly, the #3 motion to dismiss the original complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/11/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of, filed by Kenneth Alan May.(Robertson, Russell) (Entered: 04/11/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. To the extent that a reply is needed, Defendant may file such reply on or before April 19, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 04/03/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Brief re #8 Response to Motion filed by Kenneth Alan May. (Robertson, Russell) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth Alan May. (Robertson, Russell) (Entered: 03/28/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) ORDER that parties are REQUIRED to enter an election regarding the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by the magistrate judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) no later than April 27, 2023; parties are directed to use the magistrate judge consent form on the CM/ECF system to elect or decline the exercise of magistrate judge jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M Borden on March 17, 2023. (ASL) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a response to the motion on or before 03/28/2023, and Defendant may file a reply on or before 04/04/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gray M. Borden on 03/14/2023. (SUH) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Canupp, David) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 8, 2005 Regulations, #2 Exhibit B - June 25, 2015 Regulations)(Canupp, David) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4290816. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of from Walker County Circuit Court, case number 2023-900015., filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KAM). (Canupp, David) NDAL rec# B-4165 Modified on 3/13/2023 (KAM). (Entered: 03/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of Filing Notice of Removal (Canupp, David) (Entered: 03/07/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/06/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of from Walker County Circuit Court, case number 2023-900015., filed by Carbon Hill, Alabama, City of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KAM) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less