This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 09:49:25 (UTC).

May v. Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 May filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T. Parker and Keith Starrett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael T. Parker

Presiding Judge

Keith Starrett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James May

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company

XYZ Corporations 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yancy B. Burns

Attorney at BURNS & ASSOCIATES, PLLC

P. O. Box 16409

Jackson, MS 39236-6409

Defendant Attorneys

William Trey E. Jones, III

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Christopher R. Fontan

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

Claire D. Williams

Attorney at BRUNINI, GRANTHAM, GROWER & HEWES, PLLC-Jackson

P. O. Drawer 119, Pinnacle Bldg., Suite 100, 190 East Capitol St. (39201)

Jackson, MS 39205-0119

 

Court Documents

11 #5

Exhibit Commission Order

11 #4

Exhibit Complaint

11 #3

Exhibit Medical Journal Pub

11 #2

Exhibit UR Report

11 #1

Exhibit Dr. Hellstrom Letter

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James May (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Hellstrom Letter, #2 Exhibit UR Report, #3 Exhibit Medical Journal Pub, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Commission Order)(Burns, Yancy) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER setting briefing schedule re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/21/2021 (lm) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay Case pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 21, 2021 (KPM) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Stay Case by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

5 #2

Exhibit B - MWCC Docket

5 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - MWCC Docket)(Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Claire D. Williams on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Williams, Claire) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Fontan on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Fontan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company from Circuit Court of Jones County, MS, case number 2020-98-CV12. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4497911) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - All Documents Served upon Defendant)(LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by James May (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dr. Hellstrom Letter, #2 Exhibit UR Report, #3 Exhibit Medical Journal Pub, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Commission Order)(Burns, Yancy) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER setting briefing schedule re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 4/21/2021 (lm) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay Case pending a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss #5 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 21, 2021 (KPM) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay Case by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - MWCC Docket)(Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company answer due 4/12/2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 4/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on March 11, 2021. (js) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Jones, William Trey) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Claire D. Williams on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Williams, Claire) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Fontan on behalf of Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company (Fontan, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Company from Circuit Court of Jones County, MS, case number 2020-98-CV12. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0538-4497911) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - All Documents Served upon Defendant)(LDR) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY HOMESTATE COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where XYZ CORPORATIONS 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher R. Fontan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Trey E. Jones, III