This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/20/2022 at 08:42:27 (UTC).

Maxx Vega v. Terren S. Peizer et al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 Maxx Vega filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Terren S Peizer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01873

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maxx Vega

Defendants

Ontrak, Inc.

Terren S Peizer

Brandon H Laverne

Curtis Medeiros

Richard A Berman

Gustavo Giraldo

Robert Rebak

Diane Seloff

Michael Sherman

Katherine B. Quinn

Edward Zecchini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli and Klauder, LLC

1204 North Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Defendant Attorneys

Bridget J Russell

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Gian Ryan

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

John P Stigi, III

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter and Hampton LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 , Notice (Other), #15 , Notice (Other) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Notices - Select - Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER RE UNOPPOSED MOTION RE STAY, #18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT ISHEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants response to the Initial Complaint is stayed;2. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss inthe Securities Class Action to inform defendants regarding whether plaintiff intends to amend the Initial Complaint or stand on the Initial Complaint, and if plaintiff intends to amend his Initial Complaint, he shall do so within forty-five days from the date he informs defendants of his intention to amend his Initial Complaint; and 2. Within forty-five days of plaintiff either informing defendants of plaintiffs decision to stand on his Initial Complaint or filing his amended complaint, defendants shall respond to the operative complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

18 #2

Proposed Order

18 #1

Declaration of Bridget J. Russell

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini, (Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Richard A Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Gustavo Giraldo(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Brandon H Laverne(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Curtis Medeiros(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Ontrak, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Terren S Peizer(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Katherine B. Quinn(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Robert Rebak(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Diane Seloff(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Michael Sherman(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Edward Zecchini(pty:dft))(Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Ryan, Gian) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Stigi, John) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

#6

(#6) SO ORDERED Granting #5 UNOPPOSED Motion to Transfer Case to Central District of California. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#5

(#6) SO ORDERED Granting #5 UNOPPOSED Motion to Transfer Case to Central District of California. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#4

SO ORDERED, re #4 UNOPPOSED Motion and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Richard A. Berman answer due 4/8/2022; Gustavo Giraldo answer due 4/8/2022; Brandon H. LaVerne answer due 4/8/2022; Curtis Medeiros answer due 4/8/2022; Ontrak, Inc. answer due 4/8/2022; Terren S. Peizer answer due 4/8/2022; Katherine B. Quinn answer due 4/8/2022; Robert Rebak answer due 4/8/2022; Diane Seloff answer due 4/8/2022; Michael Sherman answer due 4/8/2022; Edward Zecchini answer due 4/8/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ontrak, Inc.: For All Defendants. (Ernst, Ryan) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Verification

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #14 , Notice (Other), #15 , Notice (Other) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Notices - Select - Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER RE UNOPPOSED MOTION RE STAY, #18 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: IT ISHEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Defendants response to the Initial Complaint is stayed;2. Plaintiff shall have thirty days from a ruling on the Motion to Dismiss inthe Securities Class Action to inform defendants regarding whether plaintiff intends to amend the Initial Complaint or stand on the Initial Complaint, and if plaintiff intends to amend his Initial Complaint, he shall do so within forty-five days from the date he informs defendants of his intention to amend his Initial Complaint; and 2. Within forty-five days of plaintiff either informing defendants of plaintiffs decision to stand on his Initial Complaint or filing his amended complaint, defendants shall respond to the operative complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) (Entered: 04/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss in Securities Class Action (UNOPPOSED) filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bridget J. Russell, #2 Proposed Order) (Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini, (Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Richard A Berman(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Gustavo Giraldo(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Brandon H Laverne(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Curtis Medeiros(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Ontrak, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Terren S Peizer(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Katherine B. Quinn(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Robert Rebak(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Diane Seloff(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Michael Sherman(pty:dft), Attorney Bridget J Russell added to party Edward Zecchini(pty:dft))(Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Ryan, Gian) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Russell, Bridget) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance filed by Defendants Richard A Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H Laverne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini. (Stigi, John) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Christina A. Snyder. (rba) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan M Ernst on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase transferred to United States District Court for the Central District of California. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SO ORDERED Granting #5 UNOPPOSED Motion to Transfer Case to Central District of California. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/21/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) UNOPPOSED Motion to Transfer Case to Central District of California - filed by Maxx Vega. (Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 3/21/2022 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #4 UNOPPOSED Motion and Proposed Order for Extension of Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Richard A. Berman answer due 4/8/2022; Gustavo Giraldo answer due 4/8/2022; Brandon H. LaVerne answer due 4/8/2022; Curtis Medeiros answer due 4/8/2022; Ontrak, Inc. answer due 4/8/2022; Terren S. Peizer answer due 4/8/2022; Katherine B. Quinn answer due 4/8/2022; Robert Rebak answer due 4/8/2022; Diane Seloff answer due 4/8/2022; Michael Sherman answer due 4/8/2022; Edward Zecchini answer due 4/8/2022). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/7/2022. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) UNOPPOSED Motion and Proposed Order for Extension of Time - filed by Maxx Vega. (Ernst, Ryan) Modified on 2/7/2022 (nms). [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ontrak, Inc.: For All Defendants. (Ernst, Ryan) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Verified Stockholder Derivative COMPLAINT filed against Richard A. Berman, Gustavo Giraldo, Brandon H. LaVerne, Curtis Medeiros, Ontrak, Inc., Terren S. Peizer, Katherine B. Quinn, Robert Rebak, Diane Seloff, Michael Sherman, Edward Zecchini - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3754081.) - filed by Maxx Vega. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) [Transferred from Delaware on 3/23/2022.] (Entered: 12/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bridget J Russell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John P. Stigi, III