This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:44:16 (UTC).

Maxwell v. Oliver Wyman, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Maxwell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oliver Wyman, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Douglas Maxwell

Defendants

Oliver Wyman, Inc.

Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. (MMC)

Rick Wise

Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.K. Lee

Attorney at Lee Litigation Group, PLLC

148 West 24Th Street, Ste 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10011

Defendant Attorney

Anne Melissa Seelig

Attorney at Lee Litigation Group, PLLC

148 W. 24Th Street, Ste 8Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10011

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit

#12

(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. (MMC), Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18432797)Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rick Wise. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oliver Wyman, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise. (Seelig, Anne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Oliver Wyman, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Rick Wise waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oliver Wyman, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rick Wise, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. Related document: #1 Complaint..(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anne Melissa Seelig on behalf of Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise. (Seelig, Anne) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Oliver Wyman, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Rick Wise waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/7/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney C.K. Lee. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Oliver Wyman, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; alias party name was omitted. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rick Wise. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oliver Wyman, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc.. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rick Wise, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oliver Wyman, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. (MMC), Oliver Wyman, Inc., Rick Wise. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18432797)Document filed by Douglas Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.