This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2019 at 07:54:47 (UTC).

Maxwell v. Ohio County Sheriff's Department et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Maxwell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ohio County Sheriff's Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Preston Bailey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00165

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Preston Bailey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raheem Louis Maxwell

Defendants

Jane Doe Company

Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc.

John Doe Company

Ohio County Sheriff's Department

Lindsay Transportation Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul J. Ratcliffe

Attorney at Zavolta Law Office

741 Fairmont Pike

Wheeling, WV 26003

Ronald W Zavolta

Attorney at Zavolta Law Office

741 Fairmont Pike

Wheeling, WV 26003

Jordan M. Laird

Attorney at Zavolta Law Office

741 Fairmont Pike

Wheeling, WV 26003

Defendant Attorney

BreiAnne Varner Redd

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote, LC - Wheeling

2001 Main Street, Suite 501

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #2

Exhibit 3

14 #1

Exhibit 1

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist

#9

#8

#7

#5

3 #4

Appendix A

3 #3

Supplement Memo in Support of MTD

3 #2

Appendix B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raheem Louis Maxwell re #14 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Laird, Jordan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by Raheem Louis Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3)(Laird, Jordan) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION For Extension of Time by Lindsay Transportation Solutions, Inc.. (Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 10/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/16/2020. Motions due by 12/4/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/26/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021 02:00 PM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 3/9/2021 08:30 AM in Wheeling District Judge Courtroom, North before District Judge John Preston Bailey. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/20/19. (soa) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES AND AMENDMENT OF CASE CAPTION: Approving #10 Stipulation; party defendant and case caption to be changed. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/19/19. (soa) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION for Substitution of Parties and Amendment of Case Caption by Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc.. (Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Scheduling Order Checklist)(Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF CONVERSION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ORDER GRANTING #5 EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSE: Plaintiff's deadline is extended to June 28. 2019 re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 6/6/2019. (copy to counsel via CM/ECF) (nmm) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss / Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc.. (Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Raheem Louis Maxwell re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss / Motion for Summary Judgment (Laird, Jordan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss / Motion for Summary Judgment by Raheem Louis Maxwell. (Laird, Jordan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lindsay Corporation for Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc... (Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Upon Which Relief May Be Granted by Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Supplement Memo in Support of MTD, #4 Appendix A)(Redd, BreiAnne) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER -- FIRST ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING: ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS*** : Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, ALL Non-governmental CORPORATE parties must file a DISCLOSURE STATEMENT with the Court. Forms are available on the Court's Web Site at http://www.wvnd.uscourts.gov/forms.htm Rule 26 Meeting to be held by 6/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. Initial Discovery Disclosures due by 7/8/2019. Signed by District Judge John Preston Bailey on 5/7/19. (soa) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court Papers WITH FEE PAID. Filing Fee $400. Receipt #0424-2814370 from Circuit Court of Ohio County, WV, (case number 19-C-76), filed by Lindsay Transportation Solutions and Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Traffic Crash Report, #2 Exhibit B - Order Dismissing Ohio County Sheriff's Department, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D - Motion to Dismiss, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(soa) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Barrier1 Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BreiAnne Varner Redd