This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:44 (UTC).

Maxwell v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Maxwell filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Investigation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrea K. Johnstone and Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01208

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andrea K. Johnstone

Presiding Judge

Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Maxwell

Concord, NH 03301

Defendants

William Fick

Edward Deveau

John Doe

Richard Wolfe

Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director

Massachusetts Institute of Technology

Miriam Conrad

Federal Bureau of Investigation

National Geographic Society

The Boston Globe, Inc.

Carmen Ortiz

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Return of Service Unexecuted by Mary Maxwell as to William Fick.(ko) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#8

(#8) Return of Service Executed as to Miriam Conrad, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc. by Mary Maxwell. Served/Mailed on 12/18/2019.(ko) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #3 Report and Recommendation, #6 Order on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (ko) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER approving #3 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward re: Case Assigned, Notice - ECF. (ed) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward re #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Mary Maxwell.(ko) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, recommending the court should dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/24/2019. (ko) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

2 #1

Notice ECF

#2

(#2) Summonses issued by mail as to Miriam Conrad, Edward Deveau, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, William Fick, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc., Richard Wolfe. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Miriam Conrad, Edward Deveau, John Doe, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, William Fick, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc., Richard Wolfe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14649018630) filed by Mary Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return of Service Unexecuted by Mary Maxwell as to William Fick.(ko) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return of Service Executed as to Miriam Conrad, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc. by Mary Maxwell. Served/Mailed on 12/18/2019.(ko) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #3 Report and Recommendation, #6 Order on Report and Recommendation. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed) (ko) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER approving #3 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(ko) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward re: Case Assigned, Notice - ECF. (ed) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Mail Returned- Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward re #3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Mary Maxwell.(ko) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, recommending the court should dismiss the complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Objections to R&R on 12/24/2019. (ko) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summonses issued by mail as to Miriam Conrad, Edward Deveau, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, William Fick, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc., Richard Wolfe. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-1208-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Miriam Conrad, Edward Deveau, John Doe, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Director, William Fick, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, National Geographic Society, Carmen Ortiz, The Boston Globe, Inc., Richard Wolfe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14649018630) filed by Mary Maxwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ed) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.