This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/21/2022 at 08:01:44 (UTC).

Maxwell v. CVS Pharmacy Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 Maxwell filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey V Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey V Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Maxwell

Pasadena, TX 77502

Defendants

CVS Pharmacy Inc.

H-E-B, LP

Walmart, Inc.

The Kroger Co

Walgreen Co

University Of Texas Medical Branch

Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC

UTMB Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Marie Harrington

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

1000 Louisianaste 2000

Houston, TX 77002

Gavin R Villareal

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

98 San Jacinto Blvdste. 1500

Austin, TX 78701

Sonila Themeli

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Streetsuite 3400

Houston, TX 77002

Steven R Rech

Attorney at Vorys Sater et al

909 Fanninsuite 2700

Houston, TX 77010

John Philip Griffis

Attorney at Law Offices of Phil Griffis

1322 Space Park Driveste A248

Houston, TX 77058

Jonathan M Pena

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78701

Elmore James Shepherd, III

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

600 Travis Streetsuite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) DECLARATION of Luke Sauter re: #18 Response to Motion to Remand, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

19 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Luke Sauter

18 #5

Proposed Order

18 #4

Exhibit D

18 #3

Exhibit C

18 #2

Exhibit B

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) Joint RESPONSE to #16 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, LP, The Kroger Co, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Rech, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

1 #13

Exhibit E - Consents to Removal

1 #12

Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet & State Court Docket

1 #11

Exhibit C-5 - Citation served on Walgreen Co.

1 #10

Exhibit C-4 - Citation served on The Kroger Co.

1 #9

Exhibit C3 - Citation served on H-E-B, LP

1 #8

Exhibit C-2 - Citation served on CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

1 #4

Exhibit B-3 - TRO

1 #1

Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 239th District Court of Brazoria County, TX, case number 115061-CV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27375904) filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit B-2 - TRO, #4 Exhibit B-3 - TRO, #5 Exhibit B-4 - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit B-5 - TRO, #7 Exhibit C-1 - Citation served on Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, #8 Exhibit C-2 - Citation served on CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #9 Exhibit C3 - Citation served on H-E-B, LP, #10 Exhibit C-4 - Citation served on The Kroger Co., #11 Exhibit C-5 - Citation served on Walgreen Co., #12 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet & State Court Docket, #13 Exhibit E - Consents to Removal, #14 Exhibit F - Index of All Counsel of Record)(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DECLARATION of Luke Sauter re: #18 Response to Motion to Remand, filed.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(CynthiaBenavides, 3) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND by Walgreen Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Luke Sauter)(Griffis, John) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Joint RESPONSE to #16 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, LP, The Kroger Co, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walgreen Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Rech, Steven) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed.(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Larry Maxwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Maxwell, Larry) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #12 Motion.(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss by CVS Pharmacy Inc., H-E-B, LP, The Kroger Co, Wal-Mart Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Texas LLC, Walgreen Co, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by University Of Texas Medical Branch, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING UTMBs MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(b)(1) AND 12(b)(6))(Pena, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION Access to File in CM/ECF by Larry Maxwell, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/30/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by H-E-B, LP, filed.(Villareal, Gavin) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Inc, filed.(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Kroger Co, filed.(Rech, Steven) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walgreen Co, filed.(Griffis, John) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by CVS Pharmacy Inc., filed.(Harrington, Katherine) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Inc, filed.(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Service by Wal-Mart Inc, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 09:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge Jeffrey V Brown) Parties notified.(agould, 3) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart, Inc., filed.(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 239th District Court of Brazoria County, TX, case number 115061-CV (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-27375904) filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit B-1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit B-2 - TRO, #4 Exhibit B-3 - TRO, #5 Exhibit B-4 - Plaintiff's Amended Petition, #6 Exhibit B-5 - TRO, #7 Exhibit C-1 - Citation served on Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, #8 Exhibit C-2 - Citation served on CVS Pharmacy, Inc., #9 Exhibit C3 - Citation served on H-E-B, LP, #10 Exhibit C-4 - Citation served on The Kroger Co., #11 Exhibit C-5 - Citation served on Walgreen Co., #12 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet & State Court Docket, #13 Exhibit E - Consents to Removal, #14 Exhibit F - Index of All Counsel of Record)(Themeli, Sonila) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Texas Medical Branch is a litigant

Latest cases where HEB LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant