This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2019 at 07:50:00 (UTC).

Maxim v. BackChina, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2019 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Maxim against BackChina, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03545

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew S Hanen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alex Maxim

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

BackChina, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mathew K. Higbee

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Dr., Ste 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705-5418

Defendant Attorney

William P Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd, Ste 750

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BackChina, LLC, filed.(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to BackChina, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

5 #1

Complaint

#5

(#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RubenCastroadi, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RubenCastroadi, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to BACKCHINA, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rcastro, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to BACKCHINA, LLC, filed.(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibits A - B

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BACKCHINA, LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23212169) filed by ALEX MAXIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BackChina, LLC, filed.(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to BackChina, LLC served on 9/24/2019, answer due 10/15/2019, filed.(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Register of Copyrights Notified. AO-121, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (RubenCastroadi, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(RubenCastroadi, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to BACKCHINA, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by First-class mail, filed.(rcastro, 4) (Entered: 09/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to BACKCHINA, LLC, filed.(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BACKCHINA, LLC, DOES 1 through 10 inclusive (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23212169) filed by ALEX MAXIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.