This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:53:18 (UTC).

Maxim Crude Oil, LLC v. Noil Corp., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Maxim Crude Oil, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Noil Corp , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David S Morales. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00090

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David S Morales

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maxim Crude Oil, LLC

1058 Fm 3024

George West, TX 78022

Defendants

Noil Corp., Inc.

Morrell Steve Neely

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shelby A Jordan

Attorney at Jordan & Ortiz, PC

500 N Shoreline Blvd, Ste 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Antonio Ortiz

Attorney at Jordan & Ortiz, PC

500 N Shoreline Blvd., Suite 900

Corpus Christi, TX 78401

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew R Beatty

Attorney at Beatty Navarre Strama PC

901 S. Mopac Expy., Building 1, Suite 200

Austin, TX 78746

Michael Lynn Navarre

Attorney at Beatty Navarre Strama, PC

901 S. Mopac Expy., Bldg. 1, Ste. 200

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Exhibit 1 - Neely Declaration

#24

#23

#22

20 #1

Proposed Order

#20

#15

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

5 #3

Proposed Order proposed Order

5 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - 4.26.21 email

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Morrell Steve Neely. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Neely Declaration)(Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Withdrawal of its Motion to Dismiss Noil Corp., Inc. re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss by Noil Corp., Inc., filed. (Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time Replies due by 6/17/2021.(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) First AMENDED ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by Morrell Steve Neely, Noil Corp., Inc., filed. (Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Time to File Replies in support of Defendants Motions to Dismiss by Morrell Steve Neely, Noil Corp., Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC. (Ortiz, Antonio) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC. (Ortiz, Antonio) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Noil Corp., Inc., filed.(Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC, filed.(Ortiz, Antonio) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Morrell Steve Neely, Noil Corp., Inc. filed by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC.(Ortiz, Antonio) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Morrell Steve Neely, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Neely Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Navarre, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Supplemental BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re: #6 Order, by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jensen w/Exhibits 1-13)(Ortiz, Jose) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #2 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's supplemental brief due by 5/12/2021. Defendant's supplemental brief in response due by 5/18/2021(Signed by Judge David S Morales) Parties notified.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held by Zoom before Judge David S Morales. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/5/2021. Case removed from State court. Existing TRO expires 5/10/21; Court will extend TRO until 5/20/21. Court orders briefing due by plaintiff on 5/12; defendants' due 5/18/21. Motion Hearing re Opposed motion for preliminary injunction set for 5/20/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge David S Morales. Written order to follow. Appearances: Jose Antonio Ortiz, Matthew R Beatty; Michael Navarre(Digital # 10:12 - 10:17)(ERO:Jessie Hutchinson), filed.(arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Noil Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - 4.26.21 email, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Jennifer Watson Declaration, #3 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Beatty, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Exhibit and Witness List for 5/5/21 Hearing by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC, filed.(Ortiz, Jose) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Motion Hearing via Zoom set for 5/5/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge David S Morales, filed. Zoom link can be found on the attached notice. (arodriguez, 2) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Opposed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Maxim Crude Oil, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ortiz, Jose) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 28th District Court of Nueces County, Texas, case number 2021DCV-1521-A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26378788) filed by Morrell Steve Neely, Noil Corp., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Beatty, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less