This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2020 at 11:05:03 (UTC).

Maverick Trading v. Moore et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Maverick Trading filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Moore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Tena Campbell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maverick Trading

Defendants

Emmett Moore

TradingSchools.org

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Lee Mudd, Jr.

311 Main St, Po Box 1553

Park City, UT 84060

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J. Morrison

Attorney at MORRISON LAW OFFICE

1887 N 270 E

Orem, UT 84057

Susanne Arani

799 Fieldstone Lane

Encinitas, CA 92024

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/13/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#25

(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response due by 11/12/2019); granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/12/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/24/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule of May 20, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/17/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time file a response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time Meet and Confer filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#15

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 10/15/2019 Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/30/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

9 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Nicholas Vogel

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay #5 Order to Propose Schedule deadline. Plaintiff to file a Motion for Leave to Obtain Service of Process Through Alternative Means on or before 8/2/19. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/18/19 (alt) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay #5 Order to Propose Schedule deadline. Plaintiff to file a Motion for Leave to Obtain Service of Process Through Alternative Means on or before 8/2/19. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/18/19 (alt) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: parties have until 10/22/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/1/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING of Civil Action Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#2

(#3) NOTICE OF FILING of Civil Action Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Maverick Trading is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) JUDGMENT that this case is dismissed with prejudice - CASE CLOSED. Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 11/13/19 (alt) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION of Dismissal by Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 11/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim: Response due by 11/12/2019); granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to 11/12/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/24/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION for Extension of Time Order to Propose Schedule of May 20, 2019 filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 10/17/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time file a response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: parties have until 10/22/19 to comply with #5 Order to Propose Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner on 10/1/19 (alt) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support. Responses due by 10/15/2019 Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 9/30/2019. (jwt) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension of Time file a response to Motion To Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) Modified on 9/30/2019 - modified event type to Motion for Extension of Time to FIle Response/Reply(jwt). (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time Meet and Confer filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. Motions referred to Paul M. Warner.(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2019
  • Docket(#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Paul M. Warner under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. Motion referred to Paul M. Warner. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/31/19 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Service by Publication/Other Alternative Means filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Nicholas Vogel, #2 Lexis Cited Authority, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mudd, Charles) Modified on 8/8/2019: corrected motion relief (alt) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay #5 Order to Propose Schedule deadline. Plaintiff to file a Motion for Leave to Obtain Service of Process Through Alternative Means on or before 8/2/19. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 7/18/19 (alt) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Stay re #5 Order to Propose Schedule, filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maverick Trading as to Emmett Moore served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 5/20/19 (alt) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Emmett Moore. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nl) (Entered: 05/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF FILING of Civil Action Cover Sheet re #2 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Maverick Trading. (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3236990) filed by Maverick Trading. Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Mudd, Charles) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Maverick Trading is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less