This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:00:52 (UTC).

MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC v. FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E WALKER, GARY R JONES and ALLEN C WINSOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00058

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

Presiding Judges

MARK E WALKER

ALLEN C WINSOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maven Construction Group, Inc. a/a/o Stevenson, John and Elizabeth

MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

JOHN AND ELIZABETH STEVENSON

Defendant

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EARL ISAAC HIGGS, JR

Attorney at HIGGS LAW PA - ORLANDO FL

1060 Woodcock Road, Suite 109

Orlando, FL 32803

Defendant Attorney

JOHN VINCENT GARAFFA

Attorney at BUTLER WEIHMULLER KATZ CRAIG LLP - TAMPA FL

400 North Ashley Drive, Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv58-AW/GRJ. (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#16

(#16) STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/19/19. Discovery extended and due by 1/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation to take place by 2/28/2020. Mediation Report due by 3/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#13

(#13) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. Notice of Appearance and Email Designation (HIGGS, EARL) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by EARL ISAAC HIGGS, JR on behalf of MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC (HIGGS, EARL) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Caleb Payne, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Caleb Payne, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Nicole Rofe, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Eighth Judicial Circuit in and for Alachua County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 000572 01. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4443368.), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/26/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 1:19cv58-AW/GRJ. (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) STATUS REPORT Joint by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • (#15) CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (bkp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/19/19. Discovery extended and due by 1/31/2020. Jury Trial set for 6/23/2020 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation to take place by 2/28/2020. Mediation Report due by 3/16/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/21/2020. (bkp) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AMENDED DOCUMENT by MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. Notice of Appearance and Email Designation (HIGGS, EARL) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (kdm) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by EARL ISAAC HIGGS, JR on behalf of MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC (HIGGS, EARL) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Chubb Corporation for FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #7 INITIAL Scheduling Order -- Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019. (None filed to date.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 4/1/19. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Status Report due by 5/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2019. Discovery due by 7/30/2019. (tss) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Nicole Rofe, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Caleb Payne, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Caleb Payne, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to MAVEN CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. (Mailed to Attorney: Nicole Rofe, Esq., THE LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE ROFE, PLLC, 390 North Orange Avenue Suite 2300, Orlando, Florida 32801. Phone 407-915-5447.) (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Eighth Judicial Circuit in and for Alachua County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 000572 01. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4443368.), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (GARAFFA, JOHN) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less