This case was last updated from PACER on 05/05/2020 at 08:35:34 (UTC).

Mauler v. Eagle Expressways Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Mauler filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Eagle Expressways Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Lawrence E. Kahn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Lawrence E. Kahn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Mauler

Defendants

Eagle Expressways Inc.

Phillip Tyron Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura M. Jordan

Attorney at Powers & Santola, LLP

100 Great Oaks Blvd. - Suite 123

Albany, NY 12203

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Phillip Tyron Johnson on 03/19/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Sarunas Brazdeikis/Eagle Expressways Inc. on 03/19/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

7 #1

Summons Re-Issued as to Phillip Tyron Johnson

#7

(#7) Summons Reissued as to Eagle Expressways Inc. and Phillip Tyron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Re-Issued as to Phillip Tyron Johnson) (dpk) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

6 #2

Proposed Summons Phillip Tyron Johnson

6 #1

Proposed Summons Eagle Expressways Inc.

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eagle Expressways Inc., Phillip Tyron Johnson filed by Ashley Mauler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Eagle Expressways Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Phillip Tyron Johnson)(Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Phillip Tyron Johnson on 03/10/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Sarunas Brazdeikis/Eagle Expressways Inc. on 03/10/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

2 #1

Summons issued to Phillip Tyron Johnson

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Eagle Expressways Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Phillip Tyron Johnson)(khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Eagle Expressways Inc., Phillip Tyron Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC5053563) filed by Ashley Mauler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: On 3/20/2020, Plaintiff filed proof that service of the Summons and Complaint was completed upon Defendants. Dkt. Nos. #8 and #9 . The time for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. To date, Plaintiff has not filed a request for a Clerk's Entry of Default against Defendants pursuant to Local Rule 55.2. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 5/15/2020. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 5/4/2020. (tab) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Eagle Expressways Inc. answer due 4/10/2020; Phillip Tyron Johnson answer due 4/10/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Phillip Tyron Johnson on 03/19/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Amended Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Sarunas Brazdeikis/Eagle Expressways Inc. on 03/19/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Reissued as to Eagle Expressways Inc. and Phillip Tyron Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Re-Issued as to Phillip Tyron Johnson) (dpk) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Eagle Expressways Inc., Phillip Tyron Johnson filed by Ashley Mauler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Eagle Expressways Inc., #2 Proposed Summons Phillip Tyron Johnson)(Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Eagle Expressways Inc. answer due 3/31/2020; Phillip Tyron Johnson answer due 3/31/2020. (khr) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Phillip Tyron Johnson on 03/10/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, General Order 25, Notice of Lawsuit Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, Waiver of Summons (2) and Pre-addressed pre-paid return envelope served on Sarunas Brazdeikis/Eagle Expressways Inc. on 03/10/2020, filed by Ashley Mauler. (Jordan, Laura) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/1/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Eagle Expressways Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Phillip Tyron Johnson)(khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Eagle Expressways Inc., Phillip Tyron Johnson (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC5053563) filed by Ashley Mauler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less