This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:47:09 (UTC).

Mauldin v. C&C Tires LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Mauldin filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against C C Tires LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wendy W. Berger and Leslie R. Hoffman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wendy W. Berger

Referral Judge

Leslie R. Hoffman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Archie Mauldin

Defendants

C&C Tires, LLC, d/b/a Hill Brothers Tires

Brian Carter

C&C Tires LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Constantine W. Papas

Attorney at Law Office of Constantine W. Papas, PA

Suite 106, 1277 N. Semoran Blvd.

Orlando, FL 32807

Defendant Attorney

Douglas James Collins

Attorney at Cobb Cole

P.O. Box 2491

Daytona Beach, FL 32115

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons

#24

(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter.(Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#22

(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (Collins, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MKH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (LDJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#25

(#25) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. As stated herein, the parties shall serve copies of those documents enumerated in the order upon each other by 3/13/2020; Plaintiff shall answer the Court's Interrogatories by 4/3/2020; the parties are to meet and confer by 5/1/2020; and the parties shall file their Settlement Report by 5/21/2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/21/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

#16

(#17) RESPONSE re #16 Order to show cause filed by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#1

(#18) (STRICKEN per Order at Doc. 21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter.(Collins, Douglas) Modified on 2/11/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#21

(#21) ORDER discharging #16 Order to Show Cause. The Answer (Doc. 18) is STRICKEN. The Defendants have until February 17, 2020 to move for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/11/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#19

(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#6

(#20) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. Related case(s): no (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (No attorney address on summons, to be refiled) Modified on 1/7/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#18

(#18) (STRICKEN per Order at Doc. 21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter.(Collins, Douglas) Modified on 2/11/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. Related case(s): no (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketSet deadlines: Answer to court interrogatories due by 4/3/2020, Case management report due by 5/28/2020, Joint Settlement Report due by 5/21/2020. (LDJ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. As stated herein, the parties shall serve copies of those documents enumerated in the order upon each other by 3/13/2020; Plaintiff shall answer the Court's Interrogatories by 4/3/2020; the parties are to meet and confer by 5/1/2020; and the parties shall file their Settlement Report by 5/21/2020. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/21/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter.(Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. Defendants' answer due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/12/2020. (MKH) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (Collins, Douglas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER discharging #16 Order to Show Cause. The Answer (Doc. 18) is STRICKEN. The Defendants have until February 17, 2020 to move for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. See Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman on 2/11/2020. (MDH) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. Related case(s): no (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (Collins, Douglas) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) (STRICKEN per Order at Doc. 21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter.(Collins, Douglas) Modified on 2/11/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE re #16 Order to show cause filed by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA) directing compliance with Local Rule 1.04(d). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/24/2020. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 1/10/2020. (RMF)(ctp). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to C&C Tires LLC, Brian Carter. (LDJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED summons to be issued by Archie Mauldin. (Papas, Constantine) (No attorney address on summons, to be refiled) Modified on 1/7/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Leslie R. Hoffman. New case number: 6:20-cv-19-Orl-78LRH. (SJB) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $ 400 Receipt number 113A-16318773) filed by Archie Mauldin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Papas, Constantine) Modified on 1/7/2020 (LDJ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.