This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:18:34 (UTC).

Maud Borup, Inc. v. Kohler et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Maud Borup, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kohler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02927

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Maud Borup, Inc.

2500 Highway 88, Suite 212

Minneapolis, MN 55418

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Teri M. Kohler

The Creative Partners Group, LLC

Creative Partners Group, LLC, the

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Brandt F Erwin

Attorney at Madigan, Dahl & Harlan, P.A.

222 South Ninth Street Suite 3150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Christopher W Bowman

Attorney at Madigan, Dahl & Harlan, P.A.

222 South Ninth Street, Ste 3150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Thomas P Harlan

Attorney at Madigan Dahl & Harlan, PA

222 S 9Th St Ste 3150

Mpls, MN 55402

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Benjamin R Kwan

Attorney at Haller Kwan LLP

323 Washington Ave. N., Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Ted Haller

Attorney at Haller Kwan LLP

323 Washington Ave. N., Suite 200

Minneapolis, MN 55401

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Consent Form

#7

(#7) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 2/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Teri Kohler filed by Maud Borup, Inc.. (Bowman, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Bowman on behalf of Maud Borup, Inc.. (Bowman, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Maud Borup, Inc., filed by Teri M. Kohler. (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit(s) State Action Notice of Dismissal of The Creative Partners Group, LLC

1 #3

Exhibit(s) State Court Filings

1 #2

Summons and Complaint Original Summons and Complaint with Affidavit of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV-19-19012 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7281434) filed by Teri M. Kohler. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and Complaint with Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit(s) State Action Notice of Dismissal of The Creative Partners Group, LLC) (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (MTP). Modified text on 11/20/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 2/25/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/25/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 3/3/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(TJB) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant's REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendant/Counterclaim Plaintiff Teri Kohler filed by Maud Borup, Inc.. (Bowman, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W Bowman on behalf of Maud Borup, Inc.. (Bowman, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint), COUNTERCLAIM against Maud Borup, Inc., filed by Teri M. Kohler. (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal. (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/22/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • (#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-2927 PJS/DTS. (CLK) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hennepin County District Court, case number 27-CV-19-19012 (filing fee $400, receipt number AMNDC-7281434) filed by Teri M. Kohler. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons and Complaint with Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) State Court Filings, #4 Exhibit(s) State Action Notice of Dismissal of The Creative Partners Group, LLC) (Kwan, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/20/2019 (MTP). Modified text on 11/20/2019 (lmb). (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.