This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2023 at 19:14:05 (UTC).

Mauch v. Austin Lloyd, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2022 Mauch filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Austin Lloyd, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and James M. Wicks. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-04180

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

James M. Wicks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen E. Mauch

Defendants

Austin Lloyd, Inc.

P. White Holdings, LLC

Patrick J. White

Mike Todd

Sean Klein

Christopher M. Paradise

David Schmidt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth G. Walsh

William Allinson Thomas

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stephen E. Mauch. (Walsh, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

22 #2

Exhibit B--photo

22 #1

Exhibit A--Affidavit of Service

#22

(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney Letter of William A. Thomas, Esq. filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B--photo) (Thomas, William) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15755196 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomas, William) (Entered: 07/16/2022)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#20

(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Patrick J. White served on 8/12/2022, answer due 9/2/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#19

(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Austin Lloyd, Inc. served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#18

(#18) MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney by Stephen E. Mauch. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#17

(#17) Summons Issued as to David Schmidt. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#5

(#5) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#2

(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court having been advised that this matter has settled (ECF No. #23 ), the case is dismissed, subject to reinstatement at the request of any party within 90 days. The Court retains jurisdiction to So Order any settlement documents or stipulations of dismissal if they are submitted within this period. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/23/2022. (Patterson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stephen E. Mauch. (Walsh, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2022
View Court Documents

DocketORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue. Defendant White is given a 15-day extension to September 23, 2022 in order to retain counsel and respond to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 9/8/2022. (Patterson, Samuel) (Entered: 09/08/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney Letter of William A. Thomas, Esq. filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit B--photo) (Thomas, William) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. P. White Holdings, LLC served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Patrick J. White served on 8/12/2022, answer due 9/2/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen E. Mauch. Austin Lloyd, Inc. served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/01/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) MOTION to Continue /Request for a 60 day extension to hire an attorney by Stephen E. Mauch. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) Summons Issued as to David Schmidt. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) Summons Issued as to Sean Klein. (Coleman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Stephen E. Mauch (Baxter, Jason) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge James M. Wicks. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15755196 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Stephen E. Mauch. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thomas, William) (Entered: 07/16/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less