This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 09:09:22 (UTC).

Matyszczyk et al v. Traffic Safety Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Matyszczyk filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Traffic Safety Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00169

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ewa Klopotowska

Miroslaw Matyszczyk

Defendants

Josepha Adams

Traffic Safety Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse

Martin D. Gould

Elise M. Blandin

Defendant Attorney

Patrick T Holscher

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Consent to Magistrate

#2

#3

3 #1

Affidavit

3 #2

Proposed Order

#4

4 #1

Affidavit

4 #2

Proposed Order

#5

#6

#7

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#8) (TEXT-ONLY) NOTICE of Hearing: BY TELEPHONE - All parties may appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system. Guests call:Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. Parties should have their calendars on hand for scheduling. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2020 09:00 AM before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miroslaw Matyszczyk, Ewa Klopotowska. Josepha Adams served on 9/24/2020, answer due on 10/15/2020 (Woodhouse, Gay) (Main Document 7 replaced on 10/14/2020 to remove blank pages) (Court Staff, skb). (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses, with Jury Demand by Josepha Adams, Traffic Safety Services Inc. (Holscher, Patrick) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL ENTRY: Payment of $200 received for pro hac vice fee for Martin D Gould & Elise M Blandin. Receipt CHY033647. (Court Staff, sjk) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #3 Motion for Martin D. Gould to appear pro hac vice for Miroslaw Matyszczyk and Ewa Klopotowska; and granting #4 Motion for Elise M. Blandin to appear pro hac vice for Miroslaw Matyszczyk and Ewa Klopotowska. (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Elise M. Blandin to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Ewa Klopotowska, Miroslaw Matyszczyk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Martin D. Gould to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiffs Ewa Klopotowska, Miroslaw Matyszczyk. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL ENTRY: Notice of Removal Filing Fee $400 paid on 9/10/20 by Gay Woodhouse, Receipt # CHY033573. (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miroslaw Matyszczyk, Ewa Klopotowska. Traffic Safety Services Inc served on 9/8/2020, answer due on 9/29/2020 (Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (2 summonses issued) with Jury Demand. Counsel - payment is due within 3 days. To pay the filing fee with a credit card, please use the event Notice of Civil Filing Fee in CM/ECF or send a check to the Clerk of US District Court, 2131 Capitol Avenue Room 2131, Cheyenne, WY 82001, filed by Miroslaw Matyszczyk, Ewa Klopotowska. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Consent to Magistrate) (Court Staff, skb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less